Crawford v. United States District Court for the Central (Peoria) District

Petitioner: Antonio D. Crawford
Respondent: United States District Court for the Central (Peoria) District
Case Number: 2:2019cv00129
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Christina Reiss
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable re: #2 Opinion, #4 Judgment. Mail sent to Antonio D. Crawford. (Attachments: #1 Document #2 Opinion and Order, #2 Document #4 Judgment) (law)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 JUDGMENT - Case dismissed under 1915(e)(2)(B). Signed by Deputy Clerk on 8/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Litigants (10/15/2019 appeal deadline)) (pac)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 PETITION for Writ of Mandamus (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Antonio Crawford, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (pac)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 OPINION AND ORDER Granting #1 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis and Dismissing Petition for Writ of Mandamus. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 8/12/2019. (pac)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed by Antonio D. Crawford. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Petition (sealed)) (pac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crawford v. United States District Court for the Central (Peoria) District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Antonio D. Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States District Court for the Central (Peoria) District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?