Fontaine v. Interstate Management Company, LLC
Plaintiff: Ashley Fontaine
Defendant: Interstate Management Company, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00133
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: John M Conroy
Referring Judge: Christina Reiss
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and MOTION to Stay the Proceedings filed by Ashley Fontaine. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Ashley Fontaine, #2 Certificate of Service)(Mabie, John)
September 12, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and MOTION to Stay the Proceedings filed by Interstate Management Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit of Lainnie LaCroix, #3 Exhibit A)(Kaczmarek, Christopher). Added MOTION to Stay on 9/13/2019 (law).
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #15 Second Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 9/4/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (ejh)
August 29, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #7 Complaint filed by Interstate Management Company, LLC.(Kaczmarek, Christopher)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Hilary Detmold. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 8/19/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (law)
August 13, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Hilary Detmold filed by Interstate Management Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Service)(law)
August 9, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Case Reassignment pursuant to Local Rule 73(d). CASE reassigned to Judge Christina Reiss. Judge John M. Conroy no longer assigned to the case. (law)
August 8, 2019 Filing 11 OBJECTION to Direct Assignment by Interstate Management Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(law)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by Interstate Management Company, LLC (Kaczmarek, Christopher)
August 5, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing of #1 Notice of Removal by Interstate Management Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit A) (originally filed 8/1/2019 in state court) (eh)
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Interstate Management Company, LLC served on 7/15/2019. (originally filed 7/26/2019 in state court) (eh) Text clarified on 8/8/2019 (law).
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Assigned Docket Number (originally assigned 7/15/2019 in state court). (eh)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against Interstate Management Company, LLC filed by Ashley Fontaine.(originally filed 7/15/2019 in state court) (eh)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 RECEIVED FILE and certified copy of docket sheet from State Court. (eh)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 8/5/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (eh)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 STIPULATED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Interstate Management Company, LLC.(Kaczmarek, Christopher)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER to Vermont Superior Court, Civil Division, Chittenden Unit requesting certified copy of the docket sheet and complete original file. (eh) (Main Document 2 replaced on 7/31/2019) (eh).
July 31, 2019 ISSUED Local Rule 73 Forms. (eh)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Interstate Management Company from Vermont Superior Court, Chittenden Unit, case number 595-7-19 Cncv. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (eh) Filer clarified on 7/31/2019 (law).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fontaine v. Interstate Management Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Fontaine
Represented By: John C. Mabie, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interstate Management Company, LLC
Represented By: Eric D. Jones, Esq.
Represented By: Christopher B. Kaczmarek, Esq.
Represented By: Hilary Detmold, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?