State of Vermont v. 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: State of Vermont
Defendant: Corteva, Inc., Dupont De Nemours, Inc., Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, National Foam, Inc., E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company, Chemguard, Inc., Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., The Chemours Company FC, LLC, 3M Company and Tyco Fire Products L.P.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00134
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Christina Reiss
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #37 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Jonathan I. Handler filed by Kidde-Fenwal, Inc. The Certificate of Good Standing was omitted at the time of filing. The certificate is now attached to #37 and this entry. (law)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING #37 Motion for Admission of Jonathan I. Handler, Esq. Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 8/26/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (ejh)
August 23, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Jonathan I. Handler filed by Kidde-Fenwal, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(jlh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/27/2019: #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (law).
August 21, 2019 Filing 36 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by Kidde-Fenwal, Inc. (Prescott, Adam)
August 14, 2019 UPDATE: case transferred from Vermont has been opened in District of South Carolina as case 2:19-cv-02281, filed 8/14/2019. (law)
August 14, 2019 Filing 35 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-17) In Re: Aqueous Film-Forming Foams Products Liability Litigation (MDL No. 2873). Case transferred to District of South Carolina. (Attachments: #1 Schedule CTO-17 - Tag-Along Actions)(law)
August 9, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #24 Summons Returned Executed as to The Chemours Company. The incorrect document was attached and has been replaced. The correct document is now attached to #24 and this entry. (law)
August 9, 2019 Filing 33 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Buckeye Fire Equipment Company waiver sent on 7/30/2019, answer due 9/30/2019.(Murphy, Laura)
August 9, 2019 Filing 32 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. The Chemours Company FC, LLC served on 7/30/2019, answer due 8/20/2019.(Murphy, Laura)
August 9, 2019 Filing 25 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Corteva, Inc. served on 7/30/2019. (Murphy, Laura) Answer deadline removed on 8/9/2019 pursuant to #17 Stipulation and Order (law).
August 9, 2019 Filing 24 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. The Chemours Company served on 7/30/2019.(Murphy, Laura) Answer deadline removed on 8/9/2019 pursuant to #17 Stipulation and Order (law). (Main Document 24 replaced on 8/9/2019) (law).
August 9, 2019 Filing 23 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company served on 7/30/2019.(Murphy, Laura) Answer deadline removed on 8/9/2019 pursuant to #17 Stipulation and Order (law).
August 8, 2019 Filing 31 LETTER by State of Vermont re: irregularities in #26 - #30 Summons Return Executed and all four defendants are being re-served. (originally filed 8/5/2019 in state court) (law)
August 8, 2019 Filing 30 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Chemguard, Inc. served on 7/17/2019. (originally filed 8/5/2019 in state court)(law)
August 8, 2019 Filing 29 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company served on 7/15/2019. (originally filed 8/5/2019 in state court)(law)
August 8, 2019 Filing 28 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. The Chemours Company served on 7/15/2019. (originally filed 8/5/2019 in state court)(law)
August 8, 2019 Filing 27 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Corteva, Inc. served on 7/15/2019. (originally filed 8/5/2019 in state court)(law)
August 8, 2019 Filing 26 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. The Chemours Company FC, LLC served on 7/15/2019. (originally filed 8/5/2019 in state court)(law)
August 8, 2019 Filing 22 RECEIVED UPDATED FILE and certified copy of docket sheet from State Court. (Attachments removed on 8/9/2019 (law).
August 7, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert F. McDougall, Esq on behalf of State of Vermont.(McDougall, Robert)
August 7, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Laura B. Murphy, Esq on behalf of State of Vermont.(Murphy, Laura)
August 6, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Benjamin A. Krass on behalf of State of Vermont.(Krass, Benjamin)
August 6, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew F. Pawa on behalf of State of Vermont.(Pawa, Matthew)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending time to Answer. Should the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("JPML") decline to transfer this action to the pending AFFF Multidistrict Litigation ("MDL") in the United States District Court for the District of South Carolina, Defendants shall have through and including the 28th day after such disposition to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Should the JPML transfer the action to the MDL, Defendants shall follow the MDL's established procedures for responsive pleadings. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 8/6/2019.(jbr)
August 6, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE by 3M Company re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D) (originally filed 8/1/2019 in state court)(law)
August 6, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Laura B. Murphy, Esq on behalf of State of Vermont. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (originally filed 8/1/2019 in state court)(law)
August 6, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert F. McDougall, Esq on behalf of State of Vermont. (originally filed 8/1/2019 in state court)(law)
August 6, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Kidde-Fenwal, Inc. served on 7/10/2019, answer due 7/31/2019. (originally filed 7/25/2019 in state court)(law)
August 6, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. National Foam, Inc. served on 7/10/2019, answer due 7/31/2019. (originally filed 7/25/2019 in state court)(law)
August 6, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Tyco Fire Products L.P. served on 7/10/2019, answer due 7/31/2019. (originally filed 7/25/2019 in state court)(law)
August 6, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Dupont De Nemours, Inc. served on 7/10/2019, answer due 7/31/2019. (originally filed 7/25/2019 in state court)(law)
August 6, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. 3M Company served on 7/10/2019, answer due 7/31/2019. (originally filed 7/25/2019 in state court)(law)
August 6, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED Unexecuted by State of Vermont as to Buckeye Fire Equipment Company. (originally filed 7/22/2019 in state court)(law)
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Assigned Docket Number. (originally filed 7/1/2019 in state court)(law)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against 3M Company, Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, Chemguard, Inc., The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company FC, LLC, Corteva, Inc., Dupont De Nemours, Inc., E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., National Foam, Inc., Tyco Fire Products L.P. filed by State of Vermont. (originally filed 6/26/2019 in state court) (law)
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 RECEIVED FILE and certified copy of docket sheet from State Court. (law)
August 5, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer by 3M Company (Berger, Ritchie)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER requesting certified docket sheet and original file from state court. (pac)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by 3M Company. (pac)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 3M Company, Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products L.P. from VT Superior Court, Chittenden Unit, Civil Division, case number 546-6-19 Cncv. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (pac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Vermont v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corteva, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dupont De Nemours, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Represented By: Ellen N. Corbo, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Foam, Inc.
Represented By: Keith E. Smith, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chemours Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemguard, Inc.
Represented By: Liam J. Montgomery, Esq.
Represented By: Joseph G. Petrosinelli, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde-Fenwal, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan I. Handler, Esq.
Represented By: Adam R. Prescott, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chemours Company FC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Ritchie E. Berger, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products L.P.
Represented By: Liam J. Montgomery, Esq.
Represented By: Joseph G. Petrosinelli, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Vermont
Represented By: Joshua R. Diamond, Esq.
Represented By: Laura B. Murphy, Esq.
Represented By: Robert F. McDougall, Esq.
Represented By: Thomas J. Donovan, Jr., Esq.
Represented By: Matthew F. Pawa, Esq.
Represented By: Benjamin A. Krass, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?