McDonald v. The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Julie McDonald
Defendant: The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company and Lincoln Financial Group
Case Number: 2:2019cv00154
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: John M Conroy
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Julie McDonald. The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company served on 9/26/2019, answer due 12/1/2019 (Attachments: #1 Acknowledgment of Receipt)(Anderson, Arthur)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 STIPULATED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company answer due 12/1/2019. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 10/11/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (hbc)
October 10, 2019 Filing 3 STIPULATED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company.(Decker, Byrne)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 CONSENT to Direct Assignment by Julie McDonald (Anderson, Arthur)
September 9, 2019 ISSUED Local Rule 73 Forms. (eh)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company filed by Julie McDonald. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (eh) Text clarified on 9/9/2019 (eh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDonald v. The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Financial Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie McDonald
Represented By: Arthur P. Anderson, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?