Under Cover Roofing Labor, Inc. v. Herrick et al
Plaintiff: Under Cover Roofing Labor, Inc.
Defendant: Snow Country Roofing, LLC and Kayla Herrick
Case Number: 2:2019cv00176
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: John M Conroy
Referring Judge: Christina Reiss
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Filing 29 SUPPLEMENTAL POST-HEARING MEMORANDUM re: #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Under Cover Roofing Labor, Inc. (Troy, Gordon) Text/Link clarified on 11/27/2019 (jlh).
November 18, 2019 Filing 28 ANSWER to #20 Counterclaim by Under Cover Roofing Labor, Inc..(Troy, Gordon)
November 14, 2019 Filing 27 EXHIBIT LIST Re: Preliminary Injunction Hearing held 11/14/2019. (jbr)
November 14, 2019 Filing 26 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Christina Reiss: Motion Hearing held on 11/14/2019 re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Gordon Troy, Esq., present for pltf. Dft, Kayla Herrick, present pro se. Court makes inquiries. Statements by counsel and dft. Clerk swears in Brian Horton as witness for pltf. Clerk swears in Kayla Herrick as witness. ORDERED: Supplemental/Post Hearing Memorandum due by 11/27/2019 re: is dft entitled to represent a dissolved LLC as its sole remaining member. (Court Reporter: Johanna Masse) (jbr)
November 12, 2019 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to #18 MOTION to Quash Expedited Discovery, #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #19 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Kayla Herrick, Snow Country Roofing, LLC. (Herrick, Kayla)
November 10, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kayla Herrick (Herrick, Kayla) Filer removed on 11/12/2019 (jlh).
November 8, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Quash Expedited Discovery filed by Under Cover Roofing Labor, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 )(Troy, Gordon)
November 8, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Under Cover Roofing Labor, Inc.. (Troy, Gordon)
November 7, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #19 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Snow Country Roofing, LLC. The main document and its exhibits were uploaded as a singular pdf. The document has been broken apart and reattached to the docket. The corrected documents are now attached to #19 as well as this entry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (jlh)
November 7, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs filed by Kayla Herrick. by Kayla Herrick.(Herrick, Kayla)
November 5, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Snow Country Roofing, LLC.(Herrick, Kayla) (Main Document 19 replaced on 11/7/2019) (jlh). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/7/2019: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (jlh).
November 5, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Quash Expedited Discovery and RESPONSE in Opposition re: #11 MOTION for Discovery Expedited Limited Discovery filed by Kayla Herrick.(Herrick, Kayla) Link added on 11/7/2019 (jlh)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING #15 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer until 11/7/2019. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 10/31/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (ejh)
October 30, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION/REMOVAL re: #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Under Cover Roofing Labor, Inc. Document 5 has been removed from the docket as entered separately in error. It is now attached as Exhibit 1 with its exhibits separately to #2 , and this entry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (law)
October 29, 2019 Filing 15 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Under Cover Roofing Labor, Inc. (Troy, Gordon) Event/text clarified on 10/29/2019 (law).
October 28, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #13 Summons Returned Executed. Docket text has been clarified to show Kayla Herrick served on 10/10/2019, answer due 10/31/2019. (jlh)
October 25, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Kayla Herrick served on 10/10/2019, answer due 10/31/2019.(Troy, Gordon) Dates clarified on 10/28/2019 (jlh)
October 25, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Under Cover Roofing Labor, Inc.. Snow Country Roofing, LLC served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019(Troy, Gordon)
October 22, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Expedited Limited Discovery filed by Under Cover Roofing Labor, Inc.(Troy, Gordon)
October 21, 2019 Filing 10 REVISED NOTICE of Hearing re: #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing set for 11/14/2019 at 01:00 PM in Burlington Courtroom 542 before Judge Christina Reiss.(jbr)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #8 Unopposed Motion to Continue Preliminary Injunction Hearing. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 10/18/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (ejh)
October 18, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Continue Preliminary Injunction Hearing filed by Kayla Herrick. (pac)
October 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing re: #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing set for 10/22/2019 at 01:00 PM in Burlington Courtroom 542 before Judge Christina Reiss.(jbr)
October 11, 2019 Filing 6 CASE reassigned to Judge Christina Reiss. Judge John M. Conroy no longer assigned to the case. (law)
October 8, 2019 Filing 5 Entry removed from the docket.
October 4, 2019 Filing 4 MAILED Form AO 120 to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office (Document image is sealed). (eh)
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by Under Cover Roofing Labor, Inc. (eh)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Under Cover Roofing Labor, Inc. (eh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/30/2019: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (law).
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kayla Herrick, Snow Country Roofing, LLC filed by Under Cover Roofing Labor, Inc. Summonses issued. LR 73 Forms issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (eh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Under Cover Roofing Labor, Inc. v. Herrick et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Under Cover Roofing Labor, Inc.
Represented By: Gordon E.R. Troy, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Snow Country Roofing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kayla Herrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?