Holton et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: David R. Holton and Conrad C. Benoit
Defendant: DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc., Medical Device Business Services, Inc., Johnson & Johnson and DePuy Synthes USA Products, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00186
Filed: October 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Christina Reiss
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc., DePuy Synthes USA Products, LLC, Johnson & Johnson waiver sent on 11/4/2019, answers due 1/3/2020. (Delaney, Andrew) Text clarified on 11/20/2019 (law).
October 31, 2019 REISSUED Summons(es) as to DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc., DePuy Synthes USA Products, LLC, Johnson & Johnson, Medical Device Business Services, Inc. (law)
October 22, 2019 ISSUED Summons as to DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc., DePuy Synthes USA Products, LLC, Johnson & Johnson, Medical Device Business Services, Inc.(law)
October 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc., DePuy Synthes USA Products, LLC, Johnson & Johnson, Medical Device Business Services, Inc. filed by David R. Holton, Conrad C. Benoit. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (pac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holton et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Device Business Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy Synthes USA Products, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David R. Holton
Represented By: Stefan Ricci, Esq.
Represented By: Andrew B. Delaney, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conrad C. Benoit
Represented By: Stefan Ricci, Esq.
Represented By: Andrew B. Delaney, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?