LeBlanc v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Richard J LeBlanc
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2019cv00190
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Christina Reiss
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING #19 Motion for Admission of Matthew E. Brown, Esq. Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 12/5/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (ejh)
December 4, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Matthew E. Brown filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Matthew E. Brown, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(law)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING #17 Motion of John A. Dalimonte, Esq. for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 11/26/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (ejh)
November 25, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of John A. Dalimonte filed by Richard J LeBlanc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of John A. Dalimonte, #2 Certificates of Good Standing)(law)
November 14, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John F. Evers, Esq on behalf of Richard J LeBlanc.(Evers, John)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #14 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 11/12/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (ejh)
November 8, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATED MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated.(North, Jr., Richard)
November 1, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew S. Borick, Esq on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated.(Borick, Matthew)
October 25, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFIED DOCKET SHEET from District of Arizona (MDL 15-02641-PHX DGC). (law)
October 25, 2019 Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDERS from District of Arizona (MDL 15-02641-PHX DGC). (Attachments: #1 Document 249, #2 Document 314, #3 Document 363, #4 Document 365, #5 Document 372, #6 Document 401, #7 Document 519, #8 Document 927, #9 Document 1108, #10 Document 1259, #11 Document 1319, #12 Document 1485, #13 Document 1662, #14 Document 1663, #15 Document 2238, #16 Document 2239, #17 Document 3214, #18 Document 3215, #19 Document 3372, #20 Document 3685, #21 Document 4015, #22 Document 4016, #23 Document 4141, #24 Document 4311, #25 Document 4335, #26 Document 4866, #27 Document 5007, #28 Document 5285, #29 Document 5770, #30 Document 5881, #31 Document 5883, #32 Document 6227, #33 Document 6799, #34 Document 8113, #35 Document 8871, #36 Document 9415, #37 Document 9775, #38 Document 10323, #39 Document 11011, #40 Document 11320, #41 Document 11659, #42 Document 11871, #43 Document 12061, #44 Document 12830, #45 Document 12853, #46 Document 12971, #47 Document 13329, #48 Document 15098, #49 Document 15176, #50 Document 16343, #51 Document 17494) (law)
October 25, 2019 Filing 10 MISCELLANEOUS ORDERS from District of Arizona (MDL 15-02641-PHX DGC). (Attachments: #1 Document 8872, #2 Document 8874, #3 Document 10404, #4 Document 10587, #5 Document 11321, #6 Document 11659, #7 Document 11871, #8 Document 12007, #9 Document 12061, #10 Document 12202, #11 Document 12589, #12 Document 12593, #13 Document 12853, #14 Document 12971, #15 Document 17008, #16 Document 18038) (law)
October 25, 2019 Filing 9 DAUBERT ORDERS from District of Arizona (MDL 15-02641-PHX DGC). (Attachments: #1 Document 9432, #2 Document 9433, #3 Document 9434, #4 Document 9770, #5 Document 9771, #6 Document 9772, #7 Document 9773, #8 Document 9991, #9 Document 10051, #10 Document 10052, #11 Document 10072, #12 Document 10230, #13 Document 10231, #14 Document 16992, #15 Document 17285) (law)
October 25, 2019 Filing 8 MASTER AND SHORT-FORM PLEADINGS from District of Arizona (MDL 15-02641-PHX DGC). (Attachments: #1 Document 303-2, #2 Document 363, #3 Document 364, #4 Document 365, #5 Document 366, #6 Document 927, #7 Document 1108, #8 Document 1153-1, #9 Document 1153-2, #10 Document 1485) (law)
October 25, 2019 Filing 7 DEPOSITION DESIGNATION ORDERS from District of Arizona (MDL 15-02641-PHX DGC). (Attachments: #1 Document 10403, #2 Document 10438, #3 Document 10486, #4 Document 10497, #5 Document 10524, #6 Document 10922, #7 Document 11064, #8 Document 11073, #9 Document 11080, #10 Document 11313, #11 Document 12357, #12 Document 12508, #13 Document 12590, #14 Document 12595, #15 Document 12598, #16 Document 17386, #17 Document 17513, #18 Document 17582) (law)
October 25, 2019 Filing 6 DISCOVERY AND PRIVILEGE ORDERS from District of Arizona (MDL 15-02641-PHX DGC). (Attachments: #1 Document 699, #2 Document 2813, #3 Document 4865, #4 Document 6799, #5 Document 8113, #6 Document 8315) (law)
October 25, 2019 Filing 5 MOTIONS IN LIMINE ORDERS from District of Arizona (MDL 15-02641-PHX DGC). (Attachments: #1 Document 9861, #2 Document 9881, #3 Document 10075, #4 Document 10235, #5 Document 10258, #6 Document 10382, #7 Document 10489, #8 Document 10819, #9 Document 10920, #10 Document 10947, #11 Document 11041, #12 Document 11082, #13 Document 11256, #14 Document 12507, #15 Document 12533, #16 Document 17285, #17 Docxument 17401) (law)
October 25, 2019 Filing 4 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Arizona electronically; Case Number 2:18-cv-04294.
October 25, 2019 Remark: Transferring Case to the District of Vermont via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/25/2019.]
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (SECOND). (See document for details). Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 10/17/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/25/2019.]
December 1, 2018 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-18-4294-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/25/2019.]
December 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16257017 filed by Richard J LeBlanc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/25/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LeBlanc v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard J LeBlanc
Represented By: John A. Dalimonte, Esq.
Represented By: P. Lincoln Stoller, Esq.
Represented By: John F. Evers, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr., Esq.
Represented By: Matthew S. Borick, Esq.
Represented By: Matthew E. Brown, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr., Esq.
Represented By: Matthew S. Borick, Esq.
Represented By: Matthew E. Brown, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?