Perez v. Touchette et al
Petitioner: Maria Perez
Respondent: Michael Touchette and Theresa Stone
Case Number: 2:2020cv00023
Filed: February 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: John M Conroy
Referring Judge: Christina Reiss
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2020 Filing 38 REPLY to Response to #4 MOTION to Remand filed by Maria Perez. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Manhardt, Annemarie)
February 26, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Remand filed by Theresa Stone, Michael Touchette. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bianchi, Jared)
February 26, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Theresa Stone, Michael Touchette. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Bianchi, Jared) Text clarified on 2/26/2020. (hbc)
February 25, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE of Hearing re: #33 Motion to Approve Stipulated Protective Order. Hearing set for 3/16/2020 at 8:30 AM (originally entered 2/11/2020 in state court) (eh)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 PROTECTIVE ORDER granting #33 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Helen M. Toor on 2/10/2020. (originally filed 2/10/2020 in state court) (eh) Signed by corrected on 2/28/2020 (jlh).
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER re #33 MOTION for Protective Order: The court seeks clarification as to what sorts of materials would be confidential in this case. There is a potential public interest at issue here that the court needs to weigh. Signed by Judge Helen M. Toor on 2/10 /2020. (originally entered 2/11/2020 in state court) (eh) Signed by corrected on 2/28/2020 (jlh).
February 25, 2020 Filing 34 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Response to Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories Request to Produce by Maria Perez. (originally filed 2/10/2020 in state court) (eh) Modified on 2/27/2020 to correct file date (eh).
February 25, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION to Approve Stipulated Protective Order filed by Michael Touchette. (originally filed 2/6/2020 in state court) (eh)
February 25, 2020 Filing 32 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Answer to Second Set Interrogatories and Requests to Produce by Maria Perez. (originally filed 1/29/2020 in state court) (eh) Modified on 2/27/2020 to correct file date (eh).
February 25, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 3/16/2020 at 8:30 AM. (originally entered 1/29/2020 in state court) (eh)
February 25, 2020 Filing 30 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Michael Touchette, Theresa Stone filed by Maria Perez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6) (originally filed 1/28/2020 in state court) (eh)
February 25, 2020 Filing 29 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Answer to Interrogatories and Requests to Produce by Michael Touchette. (originally filed 1/27/2020 in state court) (eh) Modified on 2/27/2020 to correct file date (eh).
February 25, 2020 Filing 28 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Interrogatories and Request to Produce by Michael Touchette. (originally filed 1/6/2020 in state court) (eh) Modified on 2/27/2020 to correct file date (eh).
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying #19 Motion to Dismiss #8 Complaint for Failure to State a Claim, Motion to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction, Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff may file any amended complaint clarifying her legal claims within 30 days. Signed by Judge Helen M. Toor on 12/23/2019. (originally filed 12/26/2019 in state court) (eh) Text clarified on 2/27/2020 (eh). Signed by corrected on 2/28/2020 (jlh).
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply. Signed by Judge Helen M. Toor on 12/17/2019. (originally filed 12/17/2019 in state court) (eh) Signed by corrected on 2/28/2020 (jlh).
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Vacating #22 Order on Motion to Stay Discovery. Signed by Judge Helen M. Toor on 12/17/2019. (originally entered 12/17/2019 in state court) (eh) Signed by corrected on 2/28/2020 (jlh).
February 25, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply as to #19 MOTION to Dismiss #8 Complaint filed by Maria Perez. (originally filed 12/15/2019 in state court) (Attachments: #1 Sur-Reply, #2 Seven Days Article) (eh)
February 25, 2020 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to #19 MOTION to Dismiss #8 Complaint filed by Michael Touchette. (originally filed 12/4/2019 in state court) (eh)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #20 Motion to Stay Discovery. Signed by Judge Helen M. Toor on 11/26/2019. (originally filed 12/2/2019 in state court) (eh) Signed by corrected on 2/28/2020 (jlh).
February 25, 2020 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Dismiss #8 Complaint filed by Maria Perez. (originally filed 11/25/2019 in state court) (Attachments: #1 VT DOC Grievance Form #3, #2 VT DOC Grievance Form #6, #3 Inmate Summary, #4 Certificate of Service) (eh)
February 25, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Michael Touchette. (originally filed 11/4/2019 in state court) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (eh)
February 25, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss #8 Complaint for Failure to State a Claim, MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction, MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Michael Touchette. (originally filed 11/4/2019 in state court) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Charles Remick, #2 Exhibits) (eh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/27/2020: #3 Certificate of Service) (eh). Modified on 2/27/2020 to correct file date (eh).
February 25, 2020 Filing 18 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE re: Plaintiff's Interrogatories and Requests for Production by Maria Perez. (originally filed 10/17/2019 in state court) (eh) Modified on 2/27/2020 to correct file date (eh).
February 25, 2020 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed re: Michael Touchette (official capacity only) (originally filed 10/11/2019 in state court) (eh)
February 25, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jared C. Bianchi, Esq on behalf of Michael Touchette. (originally filed 10/11/2019 in state court) (eh)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING/ENTRY ORDER: 11/18 to finish discovery. 1/18 for dispositive motions. Trial-ready if no motions filed. Signed by Judge Helen M. Toor on 10/2/2019. (originally filed 10/2/2019 in state court) (eh) Signed by on 2/28/2020 (jlh).
February 25, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Annemarie Manhardt, Esq on behalf of Maria Perez. (originally filed 9/16/2019 in state court) (eh)
February 25, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 10/2/2019 at 1:00 pm. (originally filed 9/4/2019 in state court) (eh)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Appointing Counsel. Signed by Judge Helen M. Toor on 8/30/2019. (originally filed 9/4/2019 in state court) (eh) Signed by corrected on 2/28/2020 (jlh).
February 25, 2020 Filing 11 LETTER advising of docket number assignment. (originally filed 8/7/2019 in state court) (eh) (Main Document 11 replaced on 2/27/2020) (eh).
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 8/2/2019. (originally filed 8/7/2019 in state court) (eh) Text clarified on 2/27/2020 (eh).
February 25, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed by Maria Perez. (originally filed 8/2/2019 in state court) (eh) (Main Document 9 replaced on 2/27/2020) (eh). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/27/2020: #1 Application to waive filing fees (redacted)) (eh).
February 25, 2020 Filing 8 COMPLAINT against Michael Touchette and Theresa Stone filed by Maria Perez. (originally filed 8/1/209 in state court) (Attachments: #1 VT DOC Grievance Form #1, #2 VT DOC Grievance Form #2, #3 VT DOC Grievance Form #3, #4 VT DOC Grievance Form #5, #5 VT DOC Grievance Form #6, #6 Letter) (eh) (Main Document 8 replaced on 2/27/2020) (eh).
February 25, 2020 Filing 7 RECEIVED FILE and certified copy of docket sheet from State Court. (eh) (Main Document 7 replaced on 2/27/2020) (eh).
February 20, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand filed by Maria Perez. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Manhardt, Annemarie)
February 20, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Annemarie Manhardt, Esq on behalf of Maria Perez. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Manhardt, Annemarie)
February 19, 2020 Filing 2 LETTER to state court requesting original case file and certified docket sheet. (kp)
February 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Michael Touchette, Theresa Stone from Vermont Superior Court, Civil Division, Chittenden Unit, case number 658-8-19 Cncv. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Attachment B, #3 Attachment C, #4 Attachment D, #5 Attachment E, #6 Attachment F, #7 Attachment G, #8 Attachment H, #9 Attachment I, #10 Attachment J, #11 Attachment K, #12 Attachment L, #13 Attachment M, #14 Attachment N, #15 Attachment O, #16 Attachment P, #17 Attachment Q, #18 Attachment R, #19 Attachment S, #20 Attachment T, #21 Attachment U, #22 Attachment V, #23 Attachment W, #24 Civil Cover Sheet)(kp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez v. Touchette et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Maria Perez
Represented By: Annemarie Manhardt, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michael Touchette
Represented By: Jared C. Bianchi, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Theresa Stone
Represented By: Jared C. Bianchi, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?