Allco Renewable Energy Limited et al v. Kulkin et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Melone, Allco Renewable Energy Limited, Otter Creek Solar LLC and PLH Vineyard Sky LLC
Defendant: Joseph Kulkin, Jane Does 1-3 and John Does 1-3
Case Number: 2:2020cv00044
Filed: March 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: John M Conroy
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY REMOVAL - Document 4 has been removed from the docket as filed in error. (law)
May 15, 2020 Filing 4 Entry removed from the docket.
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: On or before 5/26/2020, Plaintiffs shall return executed their Magistrate Judge Assignment Form in accordance with Local Rule 73(c) and shall also file their Corporate Disclosure Statement(s) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 and Local Rule 7.1. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 5/8/2020. (eh)
March 19, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by Allco Renewable Energy Limited, Otter Creek Solar LLC, PLH Vineyard Sky LLC. (eh) Modified on 3/20/2020 to correct file date (eh).
March 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Joseph Kulkin, Jane Does 1-3, John Does 1-3, filed by Allco Renewable Energy Limited, Otter Creek Solar LLC, Thomas Melone, and PLH Vineyard Sky LLC.Summons issued. LR 73 Forms issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (eh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allco Renewable Energy Limited et al v. Kulkin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Melone
Represented By: Thomas M. Melone, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allco Renewable Energy Limited
Represented By: Thomas M. Melone, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Otter Creek Solar LLC
Represented By: Thomas M. Melone, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PLH Vineyard Sky LLC
Represented By: Thomas M. Melone, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Kulkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?