Rainville v. Boxer Blake & Moore PLLC
Plaintiff: Christina Rainville
Defendant: Boxer Blake & Moore PLLC and Boxer Blake Moore & Sluka PLLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00051
Filed: April 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Christina Reiss
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim re: Plaintiff's Claim for Fraudulent Inducement (Count V) filed by Boxer Blake & Moore PLLC, Boxer Blake Moore & Sluka PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Harlow, F.)
May 29, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by F. David Harlow, Esq on behalf of Boxer Blake & Moore PLLC, Boxer Blake Moore & Sluka PLLC.(Harlow, F.)
May 12, 2020 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Boxer Blake & Moore PLLC and Boxer Blake Moore & Sluka PLLC waiver sent on 4/1/2020, answers due 6/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(kp)
April 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Boxer Blake & Moore PLLC filed by Christina Rainville. (Attachments: #1 Right to Sue Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(kp) Text clarified on 4/2/2020 (law).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rainville v. Boxer Blake & Moore PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Rainville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boxer Blake & Moore PLLC
Represented By: F. David Harlow, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boxer Blake Moore & Sluka PLLC
Represented By: F. David Harlow, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?