Winter v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Matthew Winter
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2020cv00067
Filed: May 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: John M Conroy
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #5 Affidavit of Service filed by Matthew Winter. Docket text has been corrected to read: Commissioner of Social Security answer due 8/28/2020. (law)
June 30, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Matthew Winter. Commissioner of Social Security served on 6/29/2020, answer due 8/28/2020 (Attachments: #1 Return Receipts)(Anderson, Arthur) Modified on 6/30/2020 to correct answer due date (eh).
June 17, 2020 Filing 4 CONSENT to Direct Assignment by Commissioner of Social Security (Pere, Luis)
June 15, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Luis Pere, SAUSA on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security.(Pere, Luis)
May 16, 2020 Filing 2 CONSENT to Direct Assignment by Matthew Winter (Anderson, Arthur)
May 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Matthew Winter. Summonses issued. LR 73 Forms issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (eh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winter v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Winter
Represented By: Arthur P. Anderson, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?