Boyens v. Vermont
Plaintiff: Andrew Boyens
Defendant: State of Vermont
Case Number: 2:2020cv00093
Filed: July 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: William K Sessions
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by State of Vermont.(Groff, David)
August 28, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by State of Vermont.(Groff, David)
August 28, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David R. Groff, Esq on behalf of State of Vermont.(Groff, David)
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: State of Vermont waiver sent on 7/2/2020, answer due 8/31/2020.(Appel, Robert)
July 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against State of Vermont filed by Andrew Boyens. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(law)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boyens v. Vermont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Boyens
Represented By: Robert J. Appel, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Vermont
Represented By: David R. Groff, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?