Kendall-Campbell v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Erin Kendall-Campbell
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 2:2020cv00094
Filed: July 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Christina Reiss
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATED MOTION for Leave to File a First Amended Complaint filed by Erin Kendall-Campbell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lizik, Dana)
August 19, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Erin Kendall-Campbell. Ethicon, Inc. served on 7/16/2020, answer due 8/26/2020; Johnson & Johnson served on 7/16/2020, answer due 8/26/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lizik, Dana)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion of Dana Lizik, Esq. for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 8/5/2020. (This is a text-only Order.) (ejh)
August 5, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Dana Lizik filed by Erin Kendall-Campbell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(law)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #5 Assented-To Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 7/29/2020. (This is a text-only Order.) (ejh)
July 28, 2020 Filing 5 ASSENTED-TO MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson.(Guilfoyle, Kathleen)
July 28, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Guilfoyle, Kathleen)
July 28, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kathleen M. Guilfoyle, Esq on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson.(Guilfoyle, Kathleen)
July 28, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James M. Campbell, Esq on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson.(Campbell, James)
July 1, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL ACTION COMPLAINT against Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson filed by Erin Kendall-Campbell. Summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kendall-Campbell v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc.
Represented By: Kathleen M. Guilfoyle, Esq.
Represented By: James M. Campbell, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Kathleen M. Guilfoyle, Esq.
Represented By: James M. Campbell, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Kendall-Campbell
Represented By: Gregory P. Howard, Esq.
Represented By: Dana A. Lizik, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?