Shatney v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Penny Lou Shatney
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2020cv00121
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: John M Conroy
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT to Direct Assignment by Commissioner of Social Security Administration (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Pere, Luis)
September 11, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT to Direct Assignment by Penny Lou Shatney (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (eh)
September 9, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Luis Pere, SAUSA on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security Administration.(Pere, Luis)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Counsel for both parties are advised that, when citing to the administrative record, they are required to cite to the page numbers typed in the bottom right corner of the physical record rather than to the numbers indicated on the top of the page in the courts electronic filing system (CM/ECF). (This is a text-only Order.) Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 8/25/2020. (eh)
August 25, 2020 ISSUED Summons as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (eh)
August 25, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Penny Lou Shatney. LR 73 Forms issued. (eh)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 8/25/2020. (This is a text-only Order.) (eh)
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed by Penny Lou Shatney. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Penny Lou Shatney, #2 Proposed Complaint (image is sealed), #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (eh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shatney v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Luis Pere, SAUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penny Lou Shatney
Represented By: James Torrisi, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?