Vahey v. Town of Hartford, Vermont
Plaintiff: Robert Vahey
Defendant: Town of Hartford, Vermont
Not Classified By Court: ENE Evaluator
Case Number: 2:2020cv00122
Filed: August 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: John M Conroy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATED DISCOVERY AND PLEADING SCHEDULE/ORDER Discovery due by 5/7/2021. Motions due by 6/8/2021. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 2/5/2021. Ready for Trial by 9/8/2021. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 10/6/2020. (eh)
October 6, 2020 Filing 16 PROPOSED Stipulated Discovery Schedule/Order by Town of Hartford, Vermont.(Monaghan, Brian)
October 6, 2020 Filing 15 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Monaghan, Brian)
October 1, 2020 Filing 14 ASSIGNED Early Neutral Evaluator: Michael J. Marks, Esq. (eh)
September 28, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION AS TO ENE by all parties.(Conway, III, James)
September 24, 2020 Filing 12 CONSENT to Direct Assignment by Robert Vahey (Levins, III, James)
September 18, 2020 Filing 11 CONSENT to Direct Assignment by Town of Hartford, Vermont (Conway, III, James)
September 9, 2020 Filing 10 ENE LETTER re: Potential Evaluators sent; responses due by 9/28/2020. (eh)
September 8, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Town of Hartford, Vermont.(Monaghan, Brian)
August 31, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of filing #1 Notice of Removal by Town of Hartford, Vermont. (originally filed 8/26/2020 in state court)(law)
August 31, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Town of Hartford, Vermont waiver sent on 7/7/2020, answer due 9/7/2020. (originally filed 8/26/2020 in state court)(law)
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against Town of Hartford, Vermont filed by Robert Vahey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Summons) (originally filed 6/22/2020 in state court)(law)
August 31, 2020 Filing 5 RECEIVED FILE and certified copy of docket sheet from State Court. (law)
August 28, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James G. Levins, III, Esq on behalf of Robert Vahey.(Levins, III, James)
August 26, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James F. Conway, III, Esq on behalf of Town of Hartford, Vermont.(Conway, III, James)
August 26, 2020 Filing 2 LETTER to Vermont Superior Court, Windsor Unit, Civil Division requesting original case file and certified docket sheet. (eh)
August 26, 2020 ISSUED Local Rule 73 Forms. (eh)
August 26, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Town of Hartford, Vermont from Vermont Superior Court, Windsor Unit, Civil Division, case number 20-CV-00241. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (eh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vahey v. Town of Hartford, Vermont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Vahey
Represented By: Nancy S. Corsones, Esq.
Represented By: James G. Levins, III, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Hartford, Vermont
Represented By: Brian P. Monaghan, Esq.
Represented By: James F. Conway, III, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: ENE Evaluator
Represented By: Michael J. Marks, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?