Daigle v. Stanley Black & Decker, Inc.
Plaintiff: Marshal Daigle
Defendant: Stanley Black & Decker, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00132
Filed: September 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Christina Reiss
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion of Scott E. Charnas, Esq. for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 11/6/2020. (This is a text-only Order.) (ejh)
November 5, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Scott E. Charnas (revised) re: #2 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Scott E. Charnas by Marshal Daigle. (law)
October 14, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #2 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Scott E. Charnas filed by Marshal Daigle. The Affidavit of Scott E. Charnas has been replaced now that the original has been received. The stamped document is now attached to #2 and this entry. (law)
September 25, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Scott E. Charnas filed by Marshal Daigle. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Scott E. Charnas, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(law) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/14/2020) (law).
September 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. filed by Marshal Daigle.Summons Issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daigle v. Stanley Black & Decker, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marshal Daigle
Represented By: William L. Durrell, Esq.
Represented By: Scott E. Charnas, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Black & Decker, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?