Fewer v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Cyrias J. Fewer
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2020cv00140
Filed: September 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: John M Conroy
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 0405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT to Direct Assignment by Cyrias J. Fewer (Rubenstein, Phyllis)
October 26, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cyrias J. Fewer. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Rubenstein, Phyllis)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: On or before 11/5/2020, Plaintiff shall return executed his Magistrate Judge Assignment Form. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 10/22/2020. (eh)
October 21, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT to Direct Assignment by Commissioner of Social Security (Carter, Molly)
September 30, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Molly E. Carter, SAUSA on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security.(Carter, Molly)
September 18, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Cyrias J. Fewer. Summonses issued. LR 73 Forms issued. (eh)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 9/18/2020. (This is a text-only Order.) (eh)
September 17, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed by Cyrias J. Fewer. (Attachments: #1 Application, #2 Proposed Complaint (image is sealed), #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (eh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fewer v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Molly E. Carter, SAUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cyrias J. Fewer
Represented By: Phyllis E. Rubenstein, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?