Ha et al v. Conn
Plaintiff: Jenny Pham, Jenny Ha, Johnny Ha and Helen Le
Defendant: Tina Conn
Case Number: 2:2020cv00155
Filed: September 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: William K Sessions
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2020 Filing 7 ENE LETTER re: Potential Evaluators sent; responses due by 12/3/2020. (eh)
November 16, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Jenny Pham filed by Tina Conn. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kaplan, Robert)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STIPULATION AND ORDER: Tina Conn answer due 11/16/2020. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 10/22/2020. (law)
October 21, 2020 Filing 4 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading re: #1 Complaint by Tina Conn. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kaplan, Robert) Text clarified/link added on 10/21/2020 (law).
October 21, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert J. Kaplan, Esq on behalf of Tina Conn. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kaplan, Robert)
October 13, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Tina Conn served on 10/5/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Seff, Daniel)
September 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tina Conn filed by Helen Le, Johnny Ha, Jenny Pham.Summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(law)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ha et al v. Conn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenny Pham
Represented By: Daniel A. Seff, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenny Ha
Represented By: Daniel A. Seff, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Ha
Represented By: Daniel A. Seff, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Le
Represented By: Daniel A. Seff, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tina Conn
Represented By: Robert J. Kaplan, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?