Fitzgerald v. Baker
Petitioner: Gregory Fitzgerald
Respondent: James Baker
Case Number: 2:2020cv00190
Filed: November 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Office: Burlington Office
Presiding Judge: John M Conroy
Referring Judge: Christina Reiss
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Respondent shall file an answer re: #1 Petition by 2/15/2021, any reply shall be filed 30 days thereafter. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 1/13/2021. (This is a text-only Order.) (eh)
January 12, 2021 Filing 5 STIPULATED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by James Baker.(Gilbertson, Andrew)
November 23, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew M. Gilbertson, Esq on behalf of James Baker. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gilbertson, Andrew)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Respondent shall within 60 days after the date of this Order file an answer re #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Any reply to Respondents answer shall be filed within 30 days after service of the answer upon Petitioner. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 11/17/2020. (eh)
November 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kelly Green, Esq on behalf of Gregory Fitzgerald. (eh)
November 16, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Gregory Fitzgerald. (Filing fee $ 5.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (eh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fitzgerald v. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gregory Fitzgerald
Represented By: Kelly Green, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James Baker
Represented By: Andrew M. Gilbertson, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?