USAA Casualty Insurance Company v. Mt. Mansfield Chimney Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: Mt. Mansfield Chimney Services, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00194
Filed: November 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: John M Conroy
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Mt. Mansfield Chimney Services, Inc. served on 12/7/2020, answer due 12/28/2020.(Wright, Kristin)
December 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kristin C. Wright, Esq on behalf of USAA Casualty Insurance Company.(Wright, Kristin)
December 4, 2020 Filing 2 CONSENT to Direct Assignment by USAA Casualty Insurance Company (Lynn, Pietro)
December 2, 2020 ISSUED Summons as to Mt. Mansfield Chimney Services, Inc.. (eh)
November 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mt. Mansfield Chimney Services, Inc. filed by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. LR 73 Forms issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(law)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USAA Casualty Insurance Company v. Mt. Mansfield Chimney Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mt. Mansfield Chimney Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Barbara R. Blackman, Esq.
Represented By: Pietro J. Lynn, Esq.
Represented By: Kristin C. Wright, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?