Trevathan v. State of Vermont Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Rayshunn Trevathan
Defendant: Core Civic and State of Vermont Department of Corrections
Case Number: 2:2020cv00198
Filed: November 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: John M Conroy
Referring Judge: William K Sessions
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss without prejudice filed by Rayshunn Trevathan. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(law)
December 3, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Core Civic, State of Vermont Department of Corrections re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal) (originally filed 11/30/2020 in state court)(law)
December 3, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE from Prisoners' Rights Office declining representation. (originally filed 11/3/2020 in state court) (law)
December 3, 2020 Filing 8 APPOINTMENT LETTER to Prisoners' Rights Office. (originally issued 10/21/2020 from state court) (law)
December 3, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF PRO SE APPEARANCE by Rayshunn Trevathan. (originally filed 9/21/2020 in state court)(law)
December 3, 2020 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against Core Civic, State of Vermont Department of Corrections filed by Rayshunn Trevathan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G) (originally filed 9/21/2020 in state court)(law)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Clerk on 9/21/2020. (originally filed 9/21/2020 in state court) (law)
December 3, 2020 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed by Rayshunn Trevathan. (originally filed 9/21/2020 in state court)(law)
December 3, 2020 Filing 3 RECEIVED FILE and certified copy of docket sheet from State Court. (law)
November 24, 2020 Filing 2 LETTER to Vermont Superior Court, Washington Unit, Civil Division seeking file and certified docket sheet. (law)
November 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Core Civic, State of Vermont Department of Corrections from Vermont Superior Court, Washington Unit, Civil Division, case number 312-9-20 Wncv. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Certificate of Service)(law)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trevathan v. State of Vermont Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Core Civic
Represented By: Kaveh S. Shahi, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Vermont Department of Corrections
Represented By: Kaveh S. Shahi, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rayshunn Trevathan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?