Weston v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Debbie Weston
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2021cv00024
Filed: February 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Christina Reiss
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1383
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Debbie Weston. Commissioner of Social Security Administration served on 2/9/2021, answer due 3/2/2021 (Attachments: #1 Tracking Confirmations)(Anderson, Arthur)
February 18, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Natasha Oeltjen, SAUSA on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security Administration.(Oeltjen, Natasha)
February 5, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Debbie Weston. (kp)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER GRANTING #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 2/5/2021. (This is a text-only Order.) (ejh)
February 5, 2021 ISSUED Summons as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (law)
February 4, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed by Debbie Weston. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint (Document is sealed), #2 Affidavit in Support, #3 Affidavit of Net Worth, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(kp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weston v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Weston
Represented By: Arthur P. Anderson, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Natasha Oeltjen, SAUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?