Galloway v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Linda L. Galloway
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2021cv00048
Filed: February 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: John M Conroy
Referring Judge: Kevin J Doyle
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 0405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2021 Filing 9 CONSENT to Direct Assignment by Commissioner of Social Security (Carter, Molly)
March 24, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #6 Summons Returned Executed. The attachment has been replaced as the tracking notice was omitted. The corrected document is now attached to #6 and this entry. Also, the party + date served has been clarified. The docket text now reads Commissioner of Social Security served on 3/8/2021, answer due 5/7/2021. (law)
March 24, 2021 Filing 7 CONSENT to Direct Assignment by Linda L. Galloway (Rubenstein, Phyllis)
March 24, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Commissioner served on 3/8/2021, answer due 5/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Return Receipts and Tracking Notice)(Rubenstein, Phyllis) (Attachment 1 replaced, party served + dates clarified on 3/24/2021) (law).
March 24, 2021 Filing 5 CASE reassigned to Judge Kevin J. Doyle. Judge John M. Conroy is retired effective March 21, 2021 and is no longer assigned to the case. (law)
March 15, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Molly E. Carter, SAUSA on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security.(Carter, Molly)
March 1, 2021 ISSUED Local Rule 73 Forms; ISSUED Summonses as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (eh)
February 26, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Linda L. Galloway. (eh)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 2/26/2021. (This is a text-only Order.) (eh)
February 25, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed by Linda L. Galloway. (Attachments: #1 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs, #2 Proposed Complaint (image is sealed), #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (eh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Galloway v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Molly E. Carter, SAUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda L. Galloway
Represented By: Phyllis E. Rubenstein, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?