Coffey v. State of Vermont et al
Petitioner: Gregory Coffey
Respondent: Logan Scelza, Town of Hartford Police Department, Emily Zakauskas, Ward Goodenough, Scott Moody and State of Vermont
Case Number: 2:2021cv00050
Filed: February 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: John M Conroy
Referring Judge: Kevin J Doyle
2 Judge: Christina Reiss
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CONSENTED-TO MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to #4 Complaint filed by Ward Goodenough, State of Vermont, Emily Zakauskas.(Browning, Lindsay)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lindsay N. Browning, Esq on behalf of Ward Goodenough, State of Vermont, Emily Zakauskas.(Browning, Lindsay)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Scott Moody, Logan Scelza. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Chorba, Christian)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Town of Hartford Police Department. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Chorba, Christian)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christian S. Chorba, Esq on behalf of Scott Moody, Logan Scelza, Town of Hartford Police Department. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Chorba, Christian)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian P. Monaghan, Esq on behalf of Scott Moody, Logan Scelza, Town of Hartford Police Department. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Monaghan, Brian)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Scott Moody served on 4/2/2021, answer due 4/23/2021. (eh)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Logan Scelza served on 4/2/2021, answer due 4/23/2021. (eh)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Ward Goodenough (individual and official capacities) waiver sent on 3/5/2021, answer due 5/4/2021. (eh)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Emily Zakauskas (individual and official capacities) waiver sent on 3/5/2021, answer due 5/4/2021. (eh)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: State of Vermont waiver sent on 3/5/2021, answer due 5/4/2021. (eh)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Kevin J. Doyle. Magistrate Judge John M. Conroy is retired effective March 21, 2021 and is no longer assigned to the case. (law)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order ISSUED Summons as to Scott Moody, Logan Scelza. (eh)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order ISSUED Waivers as to Ward Goodenough, State of Vermont, Emily Zakauskas. (eh)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 COMPLAINT against State of Vermont, Town of Hartford Police Department, Logan Scelza, Scott Moody, Emily Zakauskas, and Ward Goodenough filed by Gregory Coffey. (eh)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from the prison account of Gregory Coffey. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 3/2/2021. (eh)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 3/2/2021. (eh)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed by Gregory Coffey. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Statement, #2 Proposed Complaint (image is sealed)) (eh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coffey v. State of Vermont et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Logan Scelza
Represented By: Christian S. Chorba, Esq.
Represented By: Brian P. Monaghan, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Town of Hartford Police Department
Represented By: Christian S. Chorba, Esq.
Represented By: Brian P. Monaghan, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Emily Zakauskas
Represented By: Lindsay N. Browning, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ward Goodenough
Represented By: Lindsay N. Browning, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Scott Moody
Represented By: Christian S. Chorba, Esq.
Represented By: Brian P. Monaghan, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Vermont
Represented By: Lindsay N. Browning, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gregory Coffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?