U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Coughlin, Inc.
Plaintiff: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: Coughlin, Inc. doing business as McDonald's
Intervenor Plaintiff: Jennie Lumbra
Case Number: 2:2021cv00099
Filed: March 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: William K Sessions
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2021 Filing 11 ENE LETTER re: Potential Evaluators sent; responses due by 6/10/2021. (eh)
May 21, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Coughlin, Inc. waiver sent on 5/18/2021.(Levins, III, James) Text clarified on 5/23/2021 (law).
May 21, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Coughlin, Inc..(McAndrew, Karen)
May 21, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kendall A. Hoechst, Esq on behalf of Coughlin, Inc..(Hoechst, Kendall)
May 21, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Karen McAndrew, Esq on behalf of Coughlin, Inc..(McAndrew, Karen)
May 18, 2021 Filing 6 INTERVENOR COMPLAINT filed by Jennie Lumbra.(law)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting as unopposed #3 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 5/12/2021. (This is a text-only Order.) (eae)
April 19, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assent by U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission re #3 MOTION to Intervene (Linehan, Katie)
April 6, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Intervene filed by Jennie Lumbra. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of James G. Levins, Esq., #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Proposed Complaint in Intervention)(Levins, III, James) Attachment descriptions clarified on 4/6/2021 (law).
April 2, 2021 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Coughlin, Inc. waiver sent on 3/31/2021, answer due 6/1/2021.(Linehan, Katie)
March 31, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Coughlin, Inc. filed by U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(law)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Coughlin, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Katie N. Linehan, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coughlin, Inc. doing business as McDonald's
Represented By: Kendall A. Hoechst, Esq.
Represented By: Karen McAndrew, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Jennie Lumbra
Represented By: James G. Levins, III, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?