Chew v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Joann Chew
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2021cv00129
Filed: May 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Kevin J Doyle
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 0405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2021 Filing 8 CONSENT to Direct Assignment by Commissioner of Social Security (Oeltjen, Natasha)
June 22, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Natasha Oeltjen, SAUSA on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security.(Oeltjen, Natasha)
June 7, 2021 Filing 6 CONSENT to Direct Assignment by Joann Chew (Jarvis, Craig)
May 26, 2021 ISSUED Summons as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General, ISSUED Local Rule 73 Forms. (eh)
May 24, 2021 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Joann Chew. (eh)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David B. Goetz. Signed by Judge Kevin J. Doyle on 5/24/2021. (This is a text-only Order.) (eh)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Kevin J. Doyle on 5/24/2021. (This is a text-only Order.) (eh)
May 18, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David B. Goetz filed by Joann Chew. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of David B. Goetz, Esq., #2 Certificates of Good Standing)(law)
May 18, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed by Joann Chew. (Attachments: #1 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs, #2 Proposed Complaint (image is sealed), #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (eh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chew v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Natasha Oeltjen, SAUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joann Chew
Represented By: Craig A. Jarvis, Esq.
Represented By: David B. Goetz, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?