Buksh et al v. Dr. William Sarchino DPM Foot and Ankle Surgeon et al
Plaintiff: Shazad Buksh, Krishna Gathani and Gon Saman
Defendant: Dr. William Sarchino DPM Foot and Ankle Surgeon, William Sarchino, Southwestern Vermont Medical Center and Southwestern Vermont Health Care
Case Number: 2:2021cv00190
Filed: August 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: William K Sessions
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #14 Subpoena upon Office of Professional Regulation Returned Executed filed by Gon Saman, Krishna Gathani, Shazad Buksh. The document has been replaced as it was still in edit mode. The corrected document is now attached to #14 and this entry. (law)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION to Quash Subpoena filed by State of Vermont. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Browning, Lindsay)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed 09/08/2021 re: subpoena upon Office of Professional Regulation. Return filed by Shazad Buksh, Krishna Gathani, Gon Saman. (Chadwick, Evan) (Main Document 14 replaced on 10/1/2021) (law).
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to Object to Subpoena. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 9/20/2021. (This is a text-only Order.) (eae)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to Object to Subpoena filed by State of Vermont.(Browning, Lindsay) Event/text clarified on 9/20/2021 (law).
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lindsay N. Browning, Esq on behalf of State of Vermont Agency.(Browning, Lindsay)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Dr. William Sarchino DPM Foot and Ankle Surgeon, and William Sarchino waiver sent on 9/7/2021, answers due 11/8/2021.(Chadwick, Evan)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #8 Subpoena Returned Executed filed by Gon Saman, Krishna Gathani, Shazad Buksh. The document has been replaced as it was still in edit mode. The corrected document is now attached to #8 and this entry. (law)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed as to Subpoena upon Vermont Occupational Safety and Health Administration. Return filed by Shazad Buksh, Krishna Gathani, Gon Saman. (Chadwick, Evan) (Text clarified, main document 8 replaced on 9/8/2021) (law).
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #6 Subpoena Returned Executed filed by Gon Saman, Krishna Gathani, Shazad Buksh. The document has been replaced as it was still in edit mode. The corrected document is now attached to #6 and this entry. (law)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed as to Subpoena for Council on Podiatric Medicine Education. Return filed by Shazad Buksh, Krishna Gathani, Gon Saman(Chadwick, Evan) (Text clarified, main document 6 replaced on 9/8/2021) (law).
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Southwestern Vermont Health Care waiver sent on 8/26/2021, answer due 10/25/2021; Southwestern Vermont Medical Center waiver sent on 8/26/2021, answer due 10/25/2021.(Chadwick, Evan)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #2 and #3 Acknowledgment/Acceptance of Service filed by Gon Saman, Krishna Gathani, Shazad Buksh. The documents have been replaced as they were still in edit mode. The corrected documents are now attached to #2 and #3 , as well as this entry. (Attachments: #1 Document #3 ) (law)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ACKNOWLEDGMENT/ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE Executed on 09/02/2021 as to VOSHA of Subpoena filed by Shazad Buksh, Krishna Gathani, Gon Saman(Chadwick, Evan) (Main Document 3 replaced on 9/2/2021) (law).
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ACKNOWLEDGMENT/ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE Executed on 09/01/2021 as to CPME of Subpoena filed by Shazad Buksh, Krishna Gathani, Gon Saman(Chadwick, Evan) (Main Document 2 replaced on 9/2/2021) (law).
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order ISSUED Summonses as to Dr. William Sarchino DPM Foot and Ankle Surgeon, William Sarchino.(law)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dr. William Sarchino DPM Foot and Ankle Surgeon, William Sarchino, Southwestern Vermont Health Care, Southwestern Vermont Medical Center filed by Shazad Buksh, Krishna Gathani, Gon Saman. Summonses issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(law)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buksh et al v. Dr. William Sarchino DPM Foot and Ankle Surgeon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shazad Buksh
Represented By: Evan B. Chadwick, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krishna Gathani
Represented By: Evan B. Chadwick, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gon Saman
Represented By: Evan B. Chadwick, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. William Sarchino DPM Foot and Ankle Surgeon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Sarchino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwestern Vermont Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwestern Vermont Health Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?