Paulson et al v. Thomas et al
Plaintiff: Barry Paulson, Kim Paulson and Michelle Sullivan
Defendant: Barbara Thomas and Michael Thomas
Case Number: 2:2021cv00192
Filed: August 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: William K Sessions
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2021 Filing 23 WRIT OF ATTACHMENT Returned Executed on 9/29/21. Return filed by Barry Paulson, Kim Paulson, Michelle Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Nolan, Christina) Text clarified on 10/7/2021 (law).
October 6, 2021 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Barbara Thomas re: #18 Answer and #19 Notice of Appearance.(Bothfeld, Richard) Link added on 10/6/2021 (law).
October 6, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY REMOVAL: Attachment 2 has been removed from #20 Amended Answer to Complaint as attached in error. (law)
October 6, 2021 Filing 20 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Barbara Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bothfeld, Richard) (Attachment 2 removed on 10/6/2021) (law).
September 30, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard C. Bothfeld, Esq on behalf of Barbara Thomas.(Bothfeld, Richard)
September 30, 2021 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint by Barbara Thomas.(Bothfeld, Richard)
September 21, 2021 Filing 17 ISSUED Writ of of Attachment of Property and Real Estate. (document is sealed) (law)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ISSUED Order of Approval of Writ of Attachment as to Barbara Thomas, Michael Thomas. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 9/20/2021. (document is sealed) (law)
September 20, 2021 Filing 15 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge William K. Sessions III: Motion Hearing held on 9/20/2021 re #8 MOTION for Writ of Attachment. Christina Nolan, Esq. and Hannah Waite, Esq. present for plaintiffs. Barbara Thomas present pro se. Statements by counsel. Court inquires of deft. Brief recess for parties to meet + disuss. ORDERED: granting #8 MOTION for Writ of Attachment. Pltf handed original signed Order of Approval and Writ of Attachment; deft handed copy. (Court Reporter: Anne Pierce) (law)
September 19, 2021 Filing 14 SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT(S) re: #8 MOTION for Writ of Attachment by Barry Paulson, Kim Paulson, Michelle Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Nolan, Christina)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying as moot #6 Motion to Temporarily Seal #4 Ex Parte Motion for Order of Approval of Writ of Attachment, #1 Complaint. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 9/14/2021. (This is a text-only Order.) (eae)
September 14, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #10 and #11 Summonses Returned Executed. Docket text has been clarified to correct the date of service. The entries now read, respectively: Michael Thomas served on 9/8/2021, answer due 9/29/2021; Barbara Thomas served on 9/8/2021, answer due 9/29/2021. (law)
September 13, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Barbara Thomas served on 9/8/2021, answer due 9/29/2021.(Nolan, Christina) Dates clarified on 9/14/2021 (law).
September 13, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Michael Thomas served on 9/8/2021, answer due 9/29/2021.(Nolan, Christina) Dates clarified on 9/14/2021 (law).
September 1, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing re: #8 MOTION for Writ of Attachment. Motion Hearing set for 9/20/2021 at 02:30 PM in Burlington Courtroom 110 before Judge William K. Sessions III.(law)
August 30, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Writ of Attachment filed by Barry Paulson, Kim Paulson, Michelle Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of No Insurance, #2 Proposed Order of Approval of Writ of Attachment, #3 Writ of Attachment of Property and Real Estate, #4 Proposed Notice of Hearing)(Nolan, Christina)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 OPINION AND ORDER denying #4 Ex Parte Motion for Order of Approval of Writ of Attachment. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 8/19/2021. (law) Unsealed on 9/14/2021 (law).
August 18, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Temporarily Seal #1 Verified Complaint and #4 EX PARTE MOTION for Order of Approval of Writ of Attachment filed by Barry Paulson, Kim Paulson, Michelle Sullivan.(law) Unsealed on 9/14/2021 (law).
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Hannah C. Waite. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 8/11/2021. (This is a text-only Order.) (eae)
August 11, 2021 Filing 4 EX PARTE MOTION for Order of Approval of Writ of Attachment filed by Barry Paulson, Kim Paulson, Michelle Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order of Approval of Writ of Attachment, #3 Proposed Writ of Attachment of Real Estate, #4 Certificate of No Insurance)(law) Unsealed on 9/14/2021 (law).
August 11, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Hannah C. Waite, Esq. filed by Barry Paulson, Kim Paulson, Michelle Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit 1)(law)
August 11, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christina E. Nolan, Esq on behalf of Barry Paulson, Kim Paulson, Michelle Sullivan.(law)
August 11, 2021 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT against Barbara Thomas, Michael Thomas filed by Michelle Sullivan, Kim Paulson, Barry Paulson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(law)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paulson et al v. Thomas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Paulson
Represented By: Christina E. Nolan, Esq.
Represented By: Hannah C. Waite, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Paulson
Represented By: Christina E. Nolan, Esq.
Represented By: Hannah C. Waite, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Sullivan
Represented By: Christina E. Nolan, Esq.
Represented By: Hannah C. Waite, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Thomas
Represented By: Richard C. Bothfeld, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?