Brochu v. Unknown Acting Commissioner et al
Plaintiff: Alfred Brochu
Defendant: Name Unknown Acting Commissioner, Name Unknown Acting Warden, James Baker and Core Civic Corporation
Case Number: 2:2021cv00204
Filed: September 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Kevin J Doyle
Referring Judge: William K Sessions
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting Defendant Baker's #3 MOTION for Prescreening Review Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A and to stay further proceedings in this case. See Landis v. N. Am. Co., 299 U.S. 248, 254 (1936) (explaining a district court possesses inherent authority to "control the disposition of the causes on its docket" and has power to stay an action as an incident of that authority). In the interest of judicial economy, this action is STAYED until Plaintiff's August 23, 2021 #17 Amended Complaint is screened under 28 U.S.C. 1915A. See Range v. 480-486 Broadway, LLC, 810 F.3d 108, 112 (2d Cir. 2015) ("[T]he stay order here is an ordinary delay in the interest of docket control....") (internal quotation marks omitted). Signed by Judge Kevin J. Doyle on 10/4/2021. (This is a text-only Order.) (hbc)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ENTRY ORDER granting #11 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Judge Robert R. Bent on 7/16/2021. (This is a text-only Order.) (originally filed 7/16/2021 in state court) (law)
September 15, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE by James Baker of Filing #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (originally filed 9/2/2021 in state court)(law)
September 15, 2021 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against James Baker, Core Civic Corporation filed by Alfred Brochu. (originally filed 8/23/2021 in state court)(law)
September 15, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Hearing re: #11 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. Motion Hearing set for 6/28/2021 01:30 PM. (Attachments: #1 Instructions for Remote WebEx Hearing or Case Manager Conference) (originally filed 5/12/2021 in state court)(law)
September 15, 2021 Filing 15 RESPONSE re #14 Amended Complaint by James Baker. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (originally filed 3/3/2021 in state court)(law)
September 15, 2021 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against James Baker, Core Civic Corporation filed by Alfred Brochu. (originally filed 2/17/2021 in state court)(law)
September 15, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for Monday February 22, 2021 at 01:00 PM. (originally filed 1/11/2021 in state court)(law)
September 15, 2021 Filing 12 DECISION denying #6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Robert R. Bent on 12/7/2020. (originally filed 12/7/2020 in state court) (law)
September 15, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Emily Tredeau on behalf of Alfred Brochu. (originally filed 2/16/2021 in state court)(law)
September 15, 2021 Filing 10 ENTRY REGARDING MOTION: schedule hearing re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Robert R. Bent on 10/5/2020. (originally filed 10/5/2020 in state court)(law)
September 15, 2021 Filing 9 SUR-REPLY to #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Alfred Brochu. (originally filed 9/30/2020 in state court) (law)
September 15, 2021 Filing 8 REPLY to Response to #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by James Baker. (originally filed 9/30/2020 in state court) (law)
September 15, 2021 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Alfred Brochu. (originally filed 9/21/2020 in state court) (law)
September 15, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by James Baker. (originally filed 9/4/2020 in state court)(law)
September 15, 2021 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Name Unknown, Acting Warden and Name Unknown, Acting Commissioner filed by Alfred Brochu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (originally filed 4/6/2020 in state court)(law)
September 15, 2021 Filing 4 RECEIVED FILE and docket sheet electronically from State Court. (Attachments: #1 Case Summary)(law)
September 10, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Prescreening Review Pursuant to 28 USC Sec. 1915A filed by James Baker.(Eaton, Pamela)
September 3, 2021 Filing 2 LETTER to Vermont Superior Court, Washington Unit, Civil Division seeking file and certified docket sheet. (hbc)
September 2, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Name Unknown Acting Commissioner, Name Unknown Acting Warden from Vermont Superior Court, Washington Unit, Civil Div, case number 154-4-20 Wncv. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Certificate of Service) (hbc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brochu v. Unknown Acting Commissioner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred Brochu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Name Unknown Acting Commissioner
Represented By: Pamela L.P. Eaton, Esq.
Represented By: Stephen J. Soule, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Name Unknown Acting Warden
Represented By: Pamela L.P. Eaton, Esq.
Represented By: Stephen J. Soule, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Baker
Represented By: Pamela L.P. Eaton, Esq.
Represented By: Stephen J. Soule, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Core Civic Corporation
Represented By: Pamela L.P. Eaton, Esq.
Represented By: Stephen J. Soule, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?