Lewis v. Martin et al
Plaintiff: Michael J. Lewis
Defendant: Everick Danforth, Scott Martin, Mike Koehler, Rick, Joseph Paxton, Joseph Millette and Nathan Morin
Case Number: 2:2021cv00240
Filed: October 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Kevin J Doyle
Referring Judge: Christina Reiss
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lauri A. Fisher, Esq on behalf of Everick Danforth, Mike Koehler, Scott Martin, Joseph Millette, Nathan Morin, Joseph Paxton.(Fisher, Lauri)
November 19, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Nathan Morin (individual and official capacities) waiver sent on 10/15/2021, answer due 12/14/2021. (eh) File date corrected on 11/22/2021 (eh).
November 19, 2021 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Joseph Millette (individual and official capacities) waiver sent on 10/15/2021, answer due 12/14/2021. (eh)
November 19, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Joseph Paxton (individual and official capacities) waiver sent on 10/15/2021, answer due 12/14/2021. (eh)
November 19, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Everick Danforth (individual and official capacities) waiver sent on 10/15/2021, answer due 12/14/2021. (eh)
November 19, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Mike Koehler (individual and official capacities) waiver sent on 10/15/2021, answer due 12/14/2021. (eh)
November 19, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Scott Martin (individual and official capacities) waiver sent on 10/15/2021, answer due 12/14/2021. (eh)
November 4, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Michael J. Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3) (eh)
October 15, 2021 ISSUED Waivers as to Everick Danforth, Mike Koehler, Scott Martin, Joseph Millette, Nathan Morin, Joseph Paxton. (eh)
October 13, 2021 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Everick Danforth, Mike Koehler, Scott Martin, Joseph Millette, Nathan Morin, Joseph Paxton filed by Michael J. Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Supplement to Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E) (eh)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from the prison account of Michael J. Lewis. Signed by Judge Kevin J. Doyle on 10/13/2021. (eh)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Kevin J. Doyle on 10/13/2021. (eh)
October 8, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PRO SE APPEARANCE by Michael J. Lewis. (hbc)
October 8, 2021 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed by Michael J. Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Michael Lewis, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Complaint (image is sealed)) (hbc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Martin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Everick Danforth
Represented By: Lauri A. Fisher, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Martin
Represented By: Lauri A. Fisher, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Koehler
Represented By: Lauri A. Fisher, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick
Represented By: Lauri A. Fisher, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Paxton
Represented By: Lauri A. Fisher, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Millette
Represented By: Lauri A. Fisher, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Morin
Represented By: Lauri A. Fisher, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?