Peress et al v. iSun, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sassoon Peress and Renewz Sustainable Solutions, Inc.
Defendant: iSun, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2022cv00018
Filed: January 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: William K Sessions
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2022 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by iSun, Inc. (Merritt, H. Kenneth)
March 24, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by H. Kenneth Merritt, Jr., Esq. and Sharon J. Merritt, Esq. on behalf of iSun, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Merritt, H. Kenneth) Text clarified on 3/24/2022 (law).
March 24, 2022 Filing 4 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint by iSun, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Merritt, H. Kenneth)
February 1, 2022 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against iSun, Inc. filed by Sassoon Peress, Renewz Sustainable Solutions, Inc.(law)
January 31, 2022 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: iSun, Inc. waiver sent on 1/27/2022, answer due 3/28/2022.(Lynn, Pietro)
January 26, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against iSun, Inc. filed by Sassoon Peress, Renewz Sustainable Solutions, Inc. Summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(law)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peress et al v. iSun, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sassoon Peress
Represented By: Pietro J. Lynn, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renewz Sustainable Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Pietro J. Lynn, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: iSun, Inc.
Represented By: H. Kenneth Merritt, Jr., Esq.
Represented By: Sharon J. Merritt, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?