Union Mutual Fire Insurance Company v. Wintersteiger, Inc.
Plaintiff: Union Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Defendant: Wintersteiger, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2022cv00099
Filed: May 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Christina Reiss
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul Michienzie, Esq on behalf of Wintersteiger, Inc..(Michienzie, Paul)
June 7, 2022 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Wintersteiger, Inc. waiver sent on 5/9/2022, answer due 7/8/2022.(Boxer, Andrew)
May 6, 2022 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by Union Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (sjl)
May 6, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wintersteiger, Inc. filed by Union Mutual Fire Insurance Company. Summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (sjl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Union Mutual Fire Insurance Company v. Wintersteiger, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Union Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Andrew C. Boxer, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wintersteiger, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Michienzie, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?