DEntremont v. Southwestern Vermont Medical Center
Plaintiff: Guylaine DEntremont
Defendant: Southwestern Vermont Medical Center, William R. Tock, Danica Rehm-Brandt, Krystle Kalinowski, Misty Arnold, Pamela Duchene, Nancy Iserman and MaryAnn Cushings
Case Number: 2:2022cv00210
Filed: December 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Kevin J Doyle
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying without prejudice #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff may refile the application with an affidavit clearly stating her income, expenses, assets, and liabilities. Plaintiff may also file an Amended Complaint conforming to the guidance within this Order. Failure to file an amended Application, or to pay the filing fee of $402.00, on or before 2/6/2023, shall result in dismissal of the case without prejudice. Signed by Judge Kevin J. Doyle on 1/6/2023. (eh)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENTS re: 1-2 Proposed Complaint by Guylaine DEntremont. (Attachments: #1 Autopsy Report (image is sealed)) (eh) (Main Document 3 replaced on 12/14/2022 to include file date) (eh).
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE OF PRO SE APPEARANCE by Guylaine DEntremont. (eh)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed by Guylaine DEntremont. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Guylaine DEntremont, #2 Proposed Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (eh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DEntremont v. Southwestern Vermont Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guylaine DEntremont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwestern Vermont Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William R. Tock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danica Rehm-Brandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Krystle Kalinowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Misty Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Duchene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Iserman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MaryAnn Cushings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?