Lout v. ClearChoiceMD, PLLC
Plaintiff: Robert P. Lout
Defendant: ClearChoiceMD, PLLC
Case Number: 2:2023cv00008
Filed: January 10, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: William K Sessions
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 STIPULATED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 2/16/2023. (This is a text-only Order.) (eae)
February 16, 2023 Filing 6 STIPULATED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by ClearChoiceMD, PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Spero, Navah)
February 15, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Navah C. Spero, Esq on behalf of ClearChoiceMD, PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Spero, Navah)
February 14, 2023 UNSEALED Document(s): #1 Complaint only pursuant to Doc 4 (TOO), the exhibits remain sealed. (law)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #2 Motion to Seal. The Court orders that the complaint shall be unsealed. The Court orders that the exhibits attached to the complaint, however, shall remain sealed. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 2/13/2023. (This is a text-only Order.) (eae)
February 8, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. ClearChoiceMD, PLLC served on 1/26/2023, answer due 2/16/2023.(Waite, Adam)
January 10, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION to File Under Seal #1 Complaint and Exhibits filed by Robert P. Lout. (law) Unsealed on 1/12/2023 (law).
January 10, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ClearChoiceMD, PLLC filed by Robert P. Lout. Summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (exhibits are sealed)(law) Unsealed main document on 2/14/2023 pursuant to Doc 4 (TOO) (law).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lout v. ClearChoiceMD, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert P. Lout
Represented By: Adam W. Waite, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ClearChoiceMD, PLLC
Represented By: Navah C. Spero, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?