Gargano v. University of Vermont Medical Center
Plaintiff: John Andrew Gargano
Defendant: University of Vermont Medical Center
Case Number: 2:2023cv00013
Filed: January 19, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Geoffrey W Crawford
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2023 Filing 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of New York Eastern; Case Number 1:22-cv-07650.
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER: Plaintiff John Andrew Gargano brings this pro se action pursuant to the federal Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations Act ("RICO") against the University of Vermont Medical Center located in Burlington, Vermont. (Compl., Dkt. 1, at 2, 4.) Plaintiff was ordered to show cause as to why venue is proper in this district on 12/19/2022. (12/19/2022 Docket Order.) Plaintiff's #4 response does not establish that venue is proper in the Eastern District of New York. Rather, Plaintiff explained that his allegations relate to events that took place in Burlington, Vermont (Dkt. 4, at 1-2, ) and Albany County New York (Dkt. 4, at 1-2, 9-11). "In civil RICO cases...Plaintiff may properly lay venue in accordance with either 18 U.S.C. 1965 or 28 U.S.C. 1391." City of New York v. Cyco.Net, Inc., 383 F. Supp. 2d 526, 543-44 (S.D.N.Y. 2005). "[I]t is the policy in this Circuit to conflate personal jurisdiction and venue by reading the RICO venue provision to permit adjudication in any district where minimum contacts are established." Id. (internal citation omitted). Here, Plaintiff still has not alleged Defendant has minimum contacts, or any contacts, with the Eastern District of New York. Furthermore, Plaintiff has not shown that the Eastern District of New York is the proper venue under either Sections 1391(b)(1) or 1391(b)(2). Under Section 1391(b)(1), venue is proper in "a judicial district in which any defendant resides, if all defendants are residents of the State in which the district is located in." 28 U.S.C. 1391(b)(1). Here, Defendant is located in Burlington, VT. (Dkt. 1, at 2.) Thus, venue is not proper in this district pursuant to Section 1391(b)(1). Under Section 1391(b)(2), venue is proper in a judicial district "in which a substantial part of the events or omissions giving rise to the claim occurred." Here, Plaintiff's #4 response explains that his claims relate to a medical examination in Burlington, VT (Dkt. 4, at 1) and a car accident in Albany County in New York (Dkt. 4, at 1-2, 9-11). Thus, venue in this district is also not proper under Section 1391(b)(2). A district court may "if it be in the interest of justice, transfer such case to any district or division in which it could have been brought." 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). Accordingly, in the interest of justice, the Clerk of Court is hereby directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the District of Vermont. 28 U.S.C. 112(d); 1406(a). Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 1/19/2023. (FG) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 1/19/2023.]
January 19, 2023 Case electronically transferred to District of Vermont. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (FG) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 1/19/2023.]
January 18, 2023 Filing 4 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE dtd. 1/18/2023 by John Andrew Gargano. (ML) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 1/19/2023.]
December 19, 2022 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (SR) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 1/19/2023.]
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff John Andrew Gargano brings this pro se action pursuant to the federal Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations Act ("RICO"). Plaintiff alleges Defendant University of Vermont Medical Center of "filing [a] false medical report causing [his] driver['s] li[cense] [to be] suspended" among other things. (Dkt. 1, at 5.) Because Plaintiff's claims appear to relate only to a Defendant and events that are located in Chittenden County, Vermont, this Court is not the appropriate court in which to file this action. "In civil RICO cases... Plaintiff may properly lay venue in accordance with either 18 U.S.C. 1965 or 28 U.S.C. 1391." City of New York v. Cyco.Net, Inc., 383 F. Supp. 2d 526, 543-44 (S.D.N.Y. 2005). "[I]t is the policy in this Circuit to conflate personal jurisdiction and venue by reading the RICO venue provision to permit adjudication in any district where minimum contacts are established." Id. (internal citation omitted). Here, Plaintiff has not alleged Defendant has minimum contacts, or any contacts, with the Eastern District of New York. Furthermore, Plaintiff has not shown that the Eastern District of New York is the proper venue under either Sections 1391(b)(1) or 1391(b)(2). Under Section 1391(b)(1), venue is proper in "a judicial district in which any defendant resides, if all defendants are residents of the State in which the district is located in." 28 U.S.C. 1391(b)(1). Here, Defendant is located in Burlington, VT. (Dkt. 1, at 2.) Thus, venue is not proper in this district pursuant to Section 1391(b)(1). Under Section 1391(b)(2), venue is proper in a judicial district "in which a substantial part of the events or omissions giving rise to the claim occurred." Here, Plaintiff's claims relate to alleged events that occurred in Burlington, VT. (Dkt. 1, at 5.) Thus, venue is also not proper under Section 1391(b)(2). A district court may "if it be in the interest of justice, transfer such case to any district or division in which it could have been brought." 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). Accordingly, Plaintiff is ordered to show cause why this action should not be dismissed or transferred pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a) by 1/18/2023. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 12/19/2022. (LC) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 1/19/2023.]
December 16, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (SR) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 1/19/2023.]
December 16, 2022 FILING FEE: $ 402.00, receipt number 100003611 (SR) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 1/19/2023.]
December 15, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against University of Vermont Medical Center, filed by John Andrew Gargano. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (SR) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 1/19/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gargano v. University of Vermont Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Andrew Gargano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Vermont Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?