Hoisington v. R.L. Vallee, Inc.
Plaintiff: Miles E. Hoisington, Jr.
Defendant: R.L. Vallee, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2024cv00951
Filed: August 28, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Christina Reiss
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2024 Filing 3 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of New York Southern electronically; Case Number 1:24-cv-05507.
August 26, 2024 MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 2. Mailed to: Miles E. Hoisington 150 Depot Street Stowe, VT 05672. (vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/28/2024.]
August 20, 2024 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of District of Vermont.(sgz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/28/2024.]
August 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 TRANSFER ORDER: The Court transfers this action to the United States District Court for the District of Vermont, in the interest of justice. See 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). Whether Plaintiff should be permitted to proceed further without prepayment of fees is a determination to be made by the transferee court. A summons shall not issue from this Court. This order closes this case. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 8/20/2024) (sgz) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/28/2024.]
July 23, 2024 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/28/2024.]
July 17, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against R.L. Vallee, Inc.. Document filed by Miles E. Hoisington..(rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/28/2024.]
July 17, 2024 Case Designated ECF. (rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/28/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoisington v. R.L. Vallee, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.L. Vallee, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miles E. Hoisington, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?