University of Vermont Students for Justice in Palestine v. The University of Vermont and State Agricultural College et al
Plaintiff: University of Vermont Students for Justice in Palestine
Defendant: Jerome Budomo, Lina Balcom and The University of Vermont and State Agricultural College
Amicus Curiae: Foundation for Individual Rights and Expression
Case Number: 2:2024cv00978
Filed: September 9, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: William K Sessions
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 REPLY to Response to #21 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief filed by Tomas Zavalidroga. (law)
October 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #21 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by Tomas Zavalidroga filed by The University of Vermont and State Agricultural College, Lina Balcom, Jerome Budomo. (Hoechst, Kendall)
October 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief In Support of Neither Party by Foundation for Individual Rights and Expression filed by The University of Vermont and State Agricultural College, Lina Balcom, Jerome Budomo. (Hoechst, Kendall)
October 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #21 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief filed by University of Vermont Students for Justice in Palestine. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Franco, Jr., John)
October 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief filed by Tomas Zavalidroga. (law)
October 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 ASSENTED-TO MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 10/22/2024. (This is a text-only Order.) (eae)
October 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ASSENTED-TO MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Lina Balcom, Jerome Budomo, The University of Vermont and State Agricultural College. (Hoechst, Kendall) Event/text clarified, link added on 10/22/2024 (law).
October 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by University of Vermont Students for Justice in Palestine. (Franco, Jr., John)
October 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CONSENT to #14 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief In Support of Neither Party filed by University of Vermont Students for Justice in Palestine. (Franco, Jr., John) Text clarified on 10/21/2024 (law).
October 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #14 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief In Support of Neither Party filed by Foundation for Individual Rights and Expression. Attachment 2 has been removed from #14 and entered as a separate entry. See #15 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (law)
October 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by Foundation for Individual Rights and Expression. (law)
October 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief In Support of Neither Party filed by Foundation for Individual Rights and Expression. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Diaz, James) Text clarified and Attachment 2 removed on 10/21/2024 (law).
October 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE filed by James M. Diaz, Esq on behalf of Foundation for Individual Rights and Expression. (Diaz, James) Text clarified on 10/21/2024 (law).
October 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Intervene Under FRCP Rule 24 filed by The University of Vermont and State Agricultural College. (Hoechst, Kendall) Text clarified on 10/4/2024 (law).
October 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REPLY to Response to #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by University of Vermont Students for Justice in Palestine. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Supplemental Attachment 9, #3 Supplemental Attachment 10)(Franco, Jr., John) Text clarified on 10/4/2024 (law).
September 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY UPDATE re: #8 Response in Opposition to #2 Motion for Preliminary Injuction filed by Lina Balcom, Jerome Budomo, The University of Vermont and State Agricultural College. The unredacted versions for the Declaration of Lina Balcom and Exhibits 6, 9, 11 and 12 have been received, they are now attached to #8 under seal. (law)
September 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Lina Balcom, Jerome Budomo, The University of Vermont and State Agricultural College (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hoechst, Kendall)
September 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Lina Balcom, Jerome Budomo, The University of Vermont and State Agricultural College. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Declaration of Lina Balcom (redacted), #3 Declaration of David Nestor, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6 (redacted), #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9 (redacted), #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11 (redacted), #15 Exhibit 12 (redacted), #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14)(Hoechst, Kendall) Text clarified on 9/25/2024. (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/26/2024: #18 Declaration of Lina Balcom (unredacted,sealed), #19 Exhibit 6 (unredacted, sealed), #20 Exhibit 9 (unredacted, sealed), #21 Exhibit 11 (unredacted, sealed), #22 Exhibit 12 (unredacted, sealed)) (law).
September 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to File Under Seal Certain Exhibits to Their Opposition re: #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Lina Balcom, Jerome Budomo, The University of Vermont and State Agricultural College. (Hoechst, Kendall) Text clarified and link added on 9/25/2024 (law).
September 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Intervene Under FRCP Rule 24 filed by University of Vermont Students for Justice in Palestine. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Franco, Jr., John)
September 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Intervene Under FRCP Rule 24 filed by Tomas Zavalidroga. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(law)
September 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kendall A. Hoechst, Esq on behalf of Lina Balcom, Jerome Budomo, The University of Vermont and State Agricultural College.(Hoechst, Kendall)
September 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ACKNOWLEDGMENT/ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE. Linda Balcom, Jerome Budomo, The University of Vermont and State Agricultural College served on 9/11/2024, answer due 10/2/2024. (Attachments: #1 Summons as to University of Vermont and State Agricultural College, #2 Summons as to Lina Balcom, #3 Summons as to Jerome Budomo)(Franco, Jr., John) Text clarified on 9/12/2024 (law).
September 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pendent Lite filed by University of Vermont Students for Justice in Palestine. (law)
September 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT against Lina Balcom, Jerome Budomo, The University of Vermont and State Agricultural College filed by University of Vermont Students for Justice in Palestine. Summonses issued. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Attachment 1, #3 Attachment 2, #4 Attachment 3, #5 Attachment 4, #6 Attachment 5, #7 Attachment 6, #8 Attachment 7, #9 Attachment 8, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(law)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: University of Vermont Students for Justice in Palestine v. The University of Vermont and State Agricultural College et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerome Budomo
Represented By: Kendall A. Hoechst, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lina Balcom
Represented By: Kendall A. Hoechst, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The University of Vermont and State Agricultural College
Represented By: Kendall A. Hoechst, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: University of Vermont Students for Justice in Palestine
Represented By: John L. Franco, Jr., Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Foundation for Individual Rights and Expression
Represented By: James M. Diaz, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?