Adaeze Nwosu v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: Adaeze Nwosu
Defendant: Nikodimos Georgopoulos, Sartori Kalb, Officer Reid, Officer Gold, Armand J. Dusablon, John Doe Defendants, Catherine Provost, Ashima Talwar and United States Department of Homeland Security
Case Number: 2:2025cv00190
Filed: February 12, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: William K Sessions
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to File Proof of Timely Service or to Show Cause Why Case Should Not be Dismissed for Failure to Serve Defendant by 4/30/2025. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 3/27/2025. (law)
February 12, 2025 Filing 39 CASE TRANSFERRED IN electronically from District of California Central; Case Number 2:24-cv-11071.
February 12, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER TRANSFERRING ACTION TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF VERMONT by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. THEREFORE IS ORDERED in the interest of justice that this action is hereby transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Vermont. The Clerk shall effect such transfer and notify the plaintiff. [See Order for further information.] Original case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (es) [Transferred from California Central on 2/12/2025.]
February 12, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MINUTES (In Chambers) Order Striking Unauthorized Second Amended Complaint by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym: Because the Second Amended Complaint (docket no. #20 ) was improperly filed without leave of court, the Second Amended Complaint is ordered STRICKEN from the docket of this case. The operative complaint in this case is therefore the First Amended Complaint filed December 29, 2024. [See document for further information.] (es) [Transferred from California Central on 2/12/2025.]
February 5, 2025 Filing 36 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Adaeze Nwosu, (es) [Transferred from California Central on 2/12/2025.]
January 31, 2025 Filing 35 NOTICE OF FRAUD AND APPEAL TO THE SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES WITH REQUEST TO STAY PROCEEDINGS filed by plaintiff Adaeze Nwosu. [Document forward to the Supreme Court of the United States.] (mat) [Transferred from California Central on 2/12/2025.]
January 31, 2025 Filing 34 ELECTION REGARDING CONSENT to Proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge Declined, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636c filed by Plaintiff Adaeze Nwosu. The Plaintiff does not consent. (rn) [Transferred from California Central on 2/12/2025.]
January 31, 2025 Filing 22 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Filed Document RE: Amended Complaint #20 . The following error(s) was/were found: Other error(s) with document(s): Plaintiff does not have a leave to file a Second Amended Complaint.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (san) [Transferred from California Central on 2/12/2025.]
January 28, 2025 Filing 33 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Second Amended Complaint #20 filed by Plaintiff Adaeze Nwosu. (san) [Transferred from California Central on 2/12/2025.]
January 28, 2025 Filing 32 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Second Amended Complaint #20 filed by Plaintiff Adaeze Nwosu. (san) [Transferred from California Central on 2/12/2025.]
January 28, 2025 Filing 31 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Second Amended Complaint #20 filed by Plaintiff Adaeze Nwosu. (san) [Transferred from California Central on 2/12/2025.]
January 28, 2025 Filing 30 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Second Amended Complaint #20 filed by Plaintiff Adaeze Nwosu. (san) [Transferred from California Central on 2/12/2025.]
January 28, 2025 Filing 29 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Second Amended Complaint #20 filed by Plaintiff Adaeze Nwosu. (san) [Transferred from California Central on 2/12/2025.]
January 28, 2025 Filing 28 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Second Amended Complaint #20 filed by Plaintiff Adaeze Nwosu. (san) [Transferred from California Central on 2/12/2025.]
January 28, 2025 Filing 27 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Second Amended Complaint #20 filed by Plaintiff Adaeze Nwosu. (san) [Transferred from California Central on 2/12/2025.]
January 28, 2025 Filing 26 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Second Amended Complaint #20 filed by Plaintiff Adaeze Nwosu. (san) [Transferred from California Central on 2/12/2025.]
January 28, 2025 Filing 25 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Second Amended Complaint #20 filed by Plaintiff Adaeze Nwosu. (san) [Transferred from California Central on 2/12/2025.]
January 28, 2025 Filing 24 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Second Amended Complaint #20 filed by Plaintiff Adaeze Nwosu. (san) [Transferred from California Central on 2/12/2025.]
January 28, 2025 Filing 23 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Second Amended Complaint #20 filed by Plaintiff Adaeze Nwosu. (san) [Transferred from California Central on 2/12/2025.]
January 28, 2025 Filing 21 LINE WITHDRAWAL OF UNSERVED COMPLAINTS filed by Plaintiff Adaeze Nwosu. (san) [Transferred from California Central on 2/12/2025.]
January 28, 2025 Filing 20 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN BY ORDER OF THE COURT SEE DKT. #37 ] SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants amending Amended Complaint, #13 , filed by Plaintiff Adaeze Nwosu. (san) Modified on 2/12/2025 (es). [Transferred from California Central on 2/12/2025.]
January 28, 2025 Filing 19 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #15 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. Name of Court is missing "Central District of California". The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (san) [Transferred from California Central on 2/12/2025.]
January 27, 2025 Filing 17 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Received $405.00 into the registry of the Court from Adaeze Nwosu. Re: Complaint - (Referred), #1 . Receipt number Pay.gov Tracking Id: 27KRD136. (chs) [Transferred from California Central on 2/12/2025.]
January 22, 2025 Filing 18 Notice of Writ of Prohibition filed by Plaintiff Adaeze Nwosu. (san) [Transferred from California Central on 2/12/2025.]
January 14, 2025 Filing 16 Notice of Writ of Prohibition filed by Plaintiff Adaeze Nwosu. (es) [Transferred from California Central on 2/12/2025.]
January 13, 2025 Filing 15 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint, #13 filed by Plaintiff Adaeze Nwosu. (Attachments: #1 Summons.Catherin Provost)(es) [Transferred from California Central on 2/12/2025.]
January 8, 2025 Filing 14 NOTICE filed by Plaintiff Adaeze Nwosu. (san) [Transferred from California Central on 2/12/2025.]
December 31, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (sh) [Transferred from California Central on 2/12/2025.]
December 29, 2024 Filing 13 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Armand J. Dusablon, Nikodimos Georgopoulos, Gold, John Doe Defendants, Sartori Kalb, Reid, The United States Department of Homeland Security, Catherine Provost, Ashima Talwar amending Complaint - (Referred), #1 , filed by Plaintiff Adaeze Nwosu (es) [Transferred from California Central on 2/12/2025.]
December 26, 2024 Filing 12 Ex Application / Motion to Proceed Under Seal filed by Plaintiff Adaeze Nwosu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (es) [Transferred from California Central on 2/12/2025.]
December 18, 2024 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint - (Referred), #1 filed by Plaintiff Adaeze Nwosu. (sh) [Transferred from California Central on 2/12/2025.]
December 18, 2024 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint - (Referred), #1 filed by Plaintiff Adaeze Nwosu. (sh) [Transferred from California Central on 2/12/2025.]
December 18, 2024 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint - (Referred), #1 filed by Plaintiff Adaeze Nwosu. (sh) [Transferred from California Central on 2/12/2025.]
December 18, 2024 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint - (Referred), #1 filed by Plaintiff Adaeze Nwosu. (sh) [Transferred from California Central on 2/12/2025.]
December 18, 2024 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint - (Referred), #1 filed by Plaintiff Adaeze Nwosu. (sh) [Transferred from California Central on 2/12/2025.]
December 18, 2024 Filing 5 Motion for CM/ECF E-filing privileges filed by Plaintiff Adaeze Nwosu. (sh) [Transferred from California Central on 2/12/2025.]
December 18, 2024 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by Plaintiff Adaeze Nwosu. (sh) [Transferred from California Central on 2/12/2025.]
December 18, 2024 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Adaeze Nwosu. (sh) [Transferred from California Central on 2/12/2025.]
December 18, 2024 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Adaeze Nwosu, (sh) [Transferred from California Central on 2/12/2025.]
December 18, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Defendants Armand J. Dusablon, Nikodimos Georgopoulos, Gold, John Doe Defendants, Sartori Kalb, Reid, The United States Department of Homeland Security Case assigned to Judge John F. Walter and referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym., filed by Plaintiff Adaeze Nwosu. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (sh) [Transferred from California Central on 2/12/2025.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adaeze Nwosu v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adaeze Nwosu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nikodimos Georgopoulos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sartori Kalb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armand J. Dusablon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine Provost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashima Talwar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?