Avallone v. Hofmann et al
Plaintiff: Robert Avallone
Defendant: Robert Hofmann, Lesa Trowt, Susan Wehry, John Doe, Jane Doe, John Leppman, Michael Rouse, Ballard, MHM Correctional Services Inc. and Prison Health Services, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2006cv00253
Filed: February 4, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Office: Rutland Office
Presiding Judge: John M. Conroy
Presiding Judge: Christina Reiss
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 83 . Motion to Dismiss 80 is DENIED. Plaintiff shall be allowed 30 days to respond from the date of this Order to all discovery requests that are presently outstanding. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 3/15/10. (pam)
February 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 83 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: recommending that defendants' Dr. Ballard and MHM 80 MOTION to Dismiss be denied. It is further recommended that plaintiff be allowed 30 additional days to respond to all discovery requests presently outstanding. If plaintiff fails to comply, the Court should dismiss this action with prejudice for failure to obey a discovery order. Objections to R&R due by 2/22/2010. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 2/4/10. (hbc)
September 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER ADOPTING 74 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: 59 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED (all claims against dfts Hofmann, Wehry, Leppman, Rousee, Prison Health Services with regard to pltf's medical care are DISMISSED), 65 Motion to Dismiss filed by Lesa Trowt is DENIED. A certificate of appealability is DENIED because the petitioner has failed to make a substantial showing of denial of a federal right. Furthermore, it is certified that any appeal of this matter would not be taken in good faith, pursuant to 28 U.S.C.§ 1915(a)(3). Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 9/3/2009. (law)
August 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 74 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - recommending that defendants' 59 MOTION for Summary Judgment be granted, and that all claims against defendants Robert Hofmann, Susan Wehry, Dr. John Leppman, Dr. Rousse, and Prison Health Services with regard to Avallone's medical care be dismissed. It is further recommended that defendant Lisa Trowt's 65 MOTION to Dismiss be denied. Objections to R&R due by 8/28/2009. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 8/11/09. (hbc)
March 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER ADOPTING 58 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: 57 Motion to Dismiss and 55 Motion to Dismiss are DENIED; Joint Proposed Discovery Schedule due within 20 days from date of this order. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 3/31/2009. (law)
March 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 58 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that 57 MOTION to Dismiss filed by MHM Correctional Services, Inc., Dr. Ballard and 55 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Lesa Trowt be denied. It is further recommended that a new discovery deadline be imposed, with clear warning that failure to comply with that deadline will likely result in dismissal. Objections to R&R due by 3/27/2009. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 3/10/09. (hbc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Avallone v. Hofmann et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Avallone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Hofmann
Represented By: Vassily B. Fedorchenko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lesa Trowt
Represented By: Christopher C. Allen, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Wehry
Represented By: Vassily B. Fedorchenko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Leppman
Represented By: Vassily B. Fedorchenko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Rouse
Represented By: Vassily B. Fedorchenko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ballard
Represented By: Kaveh S. Shahi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MHM Correctional Services Inc.
Represented By: Kaveh S. Shahi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prison Health Services, Inc.
Represented By: Vassily B. Fedorchenko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?