Patient A v. Vermont Agency of Human Services et al
Plaintiff: Patient A
Defendant: Vermont Agency of Human Services, Vermont Department of Mental Health, Paul Dupre, Correct Care Solutions, Vermont Department of Corrections and Andrew Pallito
Case Number: 5:2014cv00206
Filed: October 2, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Office: Rutland Office
County: Caledonia
Presiding Judge: Geoffrey W. Crawford
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 135 OPINION AND ORDER denying 116 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 109 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment re: Counts I and II. Signed by Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 3/9/2016. (esb)
March 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 132 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 101 Motion for Protective Order Quashing or Modifying Regarding Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition . Signed by Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 3/1/2016. (esb)
December 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 97 OPINION AND ORDER denying 86 Motion for Certificate of Appealability re: Order Denying Summary Judgment for Interlocutory Appeal. Signed by Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 12/11/2015. (esb)
October 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 85 OPINION AND ORDER denying 47 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 10/23/2015. (esb)
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 68 OPINION AND ORDER granting 59 MOTION to Extend Expert Discovery Deadlines, defering 64 MOTION to Deny or Defer Plaintiff's Partial Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 8/18/2015. (esb)
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 17 PARTIAL MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 2/11/2015. (esb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patient A v. Vermont Agency of Human Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patient A
Represented By: Arthur J. Ruben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vermont Agency of Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vermont Department of Mental Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Dupre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correct Care Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vermont Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Pallito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?