Odell v. Somerville et al
Plaintiff: Brian K. Odell
Defendant: Kendra M. Chencus and Kurt F. Somerville
Case Number: 5:2018cv00114
Filed: July 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Office: Rutland Office
County: Orange
Presiding Judge: Geoffrey W Crawford
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to #8 Counterclaim by Brian K. Odell. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Decato, R.)
August 15, 2018 Filing 8 COUNTERCLAIM against Brian K. Odell filed by Kurt F. Somerville, Kendra M. Chencus. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D-2, #2 Exhibit D-3, #3 Exhibit D-4, #4 Certificate of Service) (esb)
August 14, 2018 Filing 7 REPLY to Response to #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Kendra M. Chencus, Kurt F. Somerville. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Fead, William) Filers and attachment description clarified on 8/14/2018 (law).
August 4, 2018 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition to #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Brian K. Odell. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Decato, R.)
July 24, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Kendra M. Chencus, Kurt F. Somerville. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Fead, William)
July 24, 2018 Filing 4 VERIFIED COMPLAINT against Kendra M. Chencus, Kurt F. Somerville filed by Brian K. Odell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (originally filed 5/25/2018) (esb)
July 24, 2018 Filing 3 RECEIVED FILE and certified copy of docket sheet from State Court. (esb)
July 17, 2018 Filing 2 LETTER to Vermont Superior Court, Orange Unit, Civil Division requesting original case file and certified docket sheet. (esb)
July 17, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kurt F. Somerville, Kendra M. Chencus from Vermont Superior Court, Orange Unit, Civil Division, case number 82-5-18-Oecv. ( Filing fee $ 400) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (esb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Odell v. Somerville et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian K. Odell
Represented By: R. Peter Decato, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kendra M. Chencus
Represented By: Darren R. Misenko, Esq.
Represented By: William A. Fead, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kurt F. Somerville
Represented By: Darren R. Misenko, Esq.
Represented By: William A. Fead, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?