High Mountain Corporation v. MVP Health Care, Inc.

Plaintiff: High Mountain Corporation
Defendant: MVP Health Care, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2018cv00171
Filed: October 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Geoffrey W Crawford
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2018 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by High Mountain Corporation (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Cooper, Heather)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 STIPULATED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to #8 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction, and #7 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction. Responses now due January 7, 2019. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 12/4/2018. (This is a text-only Order.) (jal)
November 26, 2018 Filing 12 STIPULATED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction , #7 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by High Mountain Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Cooper, Heather)
November 15, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher G. Bond, Esq on behalf of MVP Health Care, Inc..(Bond, Christopher)
November 15, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexandra E. Edelman, Esq on behalf of MVP Health Care, Inc..(Edelman, Alexandra)
November 14, 2018 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by MVP Health Care, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Karnedy, Gary)
November 14, 2018 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of #7 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by MVP Health Care, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Karnedy, Gary) Text clarified, link added on 11/15/2018 (law).
November 14, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by MVP Health Care, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Karnedy, Gary) Event/text clarified on 11/15/2018 (law).
November 14, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gary F. Karnedy, Esq on behalf of MVP Health Care, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Karnedy, Gary)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 and #4 MOTIONS for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael I. Endler and Kenneth D. McArthur, Jr. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 11/8/2018. (This is a text-only Order.) (jal)
November 7, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Kenneth D. McArthur, Jr. filed by High Mountain Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Kenneth D. McArthur, Jr., #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(jlh)
November 7, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Michael I. Endler filed by High Mountain Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Michael I. Endler, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(jlh)
November 6, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. MVP Health Care, Inc. served on 10/25/2018, answer due 11/15/2018.(Cooper, Heather)
October 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief and Permanent Injunction against MVP Health Care, Inc. filed by High Mountain Corporation.Summonses issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Civil Cover Sheet) (esb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: High Mountain Corporation v. MVP Health Care, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: High Mountain Corporation
Represented By: Heather Z. Cooper, Esq.
Represented By: Michael I. Endler, Esq.
Represented By: David R. Cooper
Represented By: Kenneth D. McArthur, Jr., Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MVP Health Care, Inc.
Represented By: Alexandra E. Edelman, Esq.
Represented By: Christopher G. Bond, Esq.
Represented By: Gary F. Karnedy, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?