Marshall et al v. Bassett et al

Plaintiff: Bruce R. Marshall and Jeanine Weir
Defendant: Karen J. Bassett and Larry S. Bassett
Case Number: 5:2018cv00196
Filed: November 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Geoffrey W Crawford
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2019 Filing 19 EVALUATOR SELECTION Response by Karen J. Bassett, Larry S. Bassett. (eh)
January 15, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF PRO SE APPEARANCE by Larry S. Bassett. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (esb)
January 15, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF PRO SE APPEARANCE by Karen J. Bassett. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (esb)
January 8, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 1/28/2019 at 1:30 PM in Rutland Courtroom before Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford. (pjl)
January 4, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bruce R. Marshall, Jeanine Weir re #10 MOTION to Subpoena (National Bank of Middlebury), #11 MOTION to Subpoena Documents (Law Offices of Fred V. Peet), #12 MOTION for Discovery MOTION Delay in Registering of Possible Default. (esb)
December 28, 2018 Filing 14 ENE LETTER re: Potential Evaluators sent; responses due by 1/14/2019. (eh)
December 27, 2018 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by Karen J. Bassett, Larry S. Bassett. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (pjl)
December 26, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Early & Expedited & Continued Discovery, MOTION for Delay in Registering of Possible Default filed by Bruce R. Marshall, Jeanine Weir. (pac)
December 26, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Subpoena Documents (Law Offices of Fred V. Peet) filed by Bruce R. Marshall, Jeanine Weir. (Attachments: #1 Subpoena) (pac)
December 26, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Subpoena (National Bank of Middlebury) filed by Bruce R. Marshall, Jeanine Weir. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Subpoena) (pac)
December 7, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Karen J. Bassett served on 12/3/2018, answer due 12/24/2018. (esb)
December 7, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Larry S. Bassett served on 12/3/2018, answer due 12/24/2018. (esb)
November 30, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bruce R. Marshall, Jeanine Weir re #5 MOTION to Freeze Assets.(esb)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 MOTION to File Under Seal re: Exhibits A2, A4 and G2 re: #1 Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 11/26/2018. (This is a text-only Order.) (jal)
November 21, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Freeze Assets filed by Bruce R. Marshall, Jeanine Weir. (esb)
November 19, 2018 ISSUED Summons as to Karen J. Bassett, Larry S. Bassett. (esb)
November 19, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF PRO-SE APPEARANCE by Jeanine Weir.(esb)
November 19, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF PRO-SE APPEARANCE by Bruce R. Marshall.(esb)
November 19, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to File Under Seal re: Exhibits A2, A4 and G2 re: #1 Complaint filed by Bruce R. Marshall, Jeanine Weir. (esb) Event/text clarified and unsealed on 11/20/2018 (law).
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Karen J. Bassett, Larry S. Bassett filed by Bruce R. Marshall, Jeanine Weir. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A1, #3 Exhibit A2 (image is sealed), #4 Exhibit A3, #5 Exhibit A4 (image is sealed), #6 Exhibit A5, #7 Exhibit A6, #8 Exhibit A7, #9 Exhibit A8, #10 Exhibit A9, #11 Exhibit B1, #12 Exhibit B2, #13 Exhibit C1, #14 Exhibit C2, #15 Exhibit C3, #16 Exhibit C4, #17 Exhibit C5, #18 Exhibit C6, #19 Exhibit C7, #20 Exhibit C8, #21 Exhibit D1, #22 Exhibit D2, #23 Exhibit D3, #24 Exhibit D4, #25 Exhibit D5, #26 Exhibit D6, #27 Exhibit D7, #28 Exhibit D8, #29 Exhibit E1, #30 Exhibit E2, #31 Exhibit E3, #32 Exhibit E4, #33 Exhibit F1, #34 Exhibit F2, #35 Exhibit F3, #36 Exhibit G, #37 Exhibit G1, #38 Exhibit G2 (image is sealed), #39 Exhibit H, #40 Exhibit I, #41 Exhibit J, #42 Exhibit K, #43 Exhibit L1, #44 Exhibit L2, #45 Exhibit L3, #46 Exhibit L4, #47 Exhibit L5, #48 Exhibit L6, #49 Exhibit M, #50 Exhibit N, #51 Exhibit O, #52 Exhibit P1, #53 Exhibit P2, #54 Exhibit P3, #55 Exhibit P4, #56 Exhibit P5, #57 Exhibit P6, #58 Civil Cover Sheet)(esb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marshall et al v. Bassett et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce R. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanine Weir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen J. Bassett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry S. Bassett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?