Carpentino v. Lyons

Plaintiff: Kurt Carpentino
Defendant: Mike Lyons and VT Southern State Correctional Facility, Superintendent
Case Number: 5:2018cv00207
Filed: December 5, 2018
Court: Vermont District Court
Presiding Judge: Geoffrey W Crawford
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 5, 2018 4 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of New Hampshire; Case Number 1:18-cv-01096.
December 3, 2018 3 Featured Case ORDER. A transfer of this case to the District of Vermont is appropriate and in the interest of justice. The clerk's office is directed to transfer this case to the District of Vermont, and to notify the clerk's office in that district that plaintiff has requested injunctive relief in the complaint. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(de) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 12/5/2018.]
November 28, 2018 2 NOTICE - Filing Fee Omitted. Either the filing fee or an application to proceed without fees or costs must be submitted within 60 days. If proceeding without prepayment of fees or costs is sought the court needs: Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs,Certificate of Custodial Institution, and Prisoner Consent Form. Compliance Deadline set for 1/28/2019.(mc) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 12/5/2018.]
November 28, 2018 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 12/5/2018.]
November 2, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-1096-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 12/5/2018.]
November 2, 2018 1 COMPLAINT with Motion for Injunction against VT Southern State Correctional Facility, Superintendent filed by Kurt Carpentino.(mc) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 12/5/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carpentino v. Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VT Southern State Correctional Facility, Superintendent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kurt Carpentino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?