LaPlante v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Jessica Maria LaPlante
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 5:2018cv00209
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: Vermont District Court
Presiding Judge: Geoffrey W Crawford
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 6 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #5 Affidavit of Service filed by Jessica Maria LaPlante. Docket text has been clarified to indicate the answer is due 03/04/2019. (jlh)
January 30, 2019 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Jessica Maria LaPlante. Commissioner of Social Security served on 1/2/2019, answer due 3/4/2019 (Attachments: #1 Return receipts)(Anderson, Arthur) Answer due date corrected on 1/31/2019 (jlh)
January 10, 2019 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kathryn S. Pollack, SAUSA on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security.(Pollack, Kathryn)
December 6, 2018 3 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Jessica Maria LaPlante.Summonses issued. (esb)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order 2 ORDER granting #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 12/6/2018. (This is a text-only Order.) (jal)
December 6, 2018 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed by Jessica Maria LaPlante. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jessica LaPlante, #2 Proposed Complaint (image is sealed), #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (esb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LaPlante v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Kathryn S. Pollack, SAUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Maria LaPlante
Represented By: Arthur P. Anderson, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?