Blasius v. Bayer Healthcare Pharmauceuticals, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Courtney C. Blasius
Defendant: Bayer Healthcare LLC, Bayer AG, Bayer Schering Pharma AG, Berlex Laboratories, Inc., Berlex, Inc., Bayer Corporation, Bayer Pharmaceuticals Corporation and Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Case Number: 5:2018cv00223
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Geoffrey W Crawford
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2018 Filing 52 CASE TRANSFERRED in from District of Illinois Southern; Case Number 3:10-cv-10797.
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO OTHER DISTRICT pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a): Case transferred to United States District Court for the District of Vermont. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to transmit the complete file in this case to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the District of Vermont. Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 12/7/2018. (Attachments: Joint Remand and Transfer Memorandum).(ceh) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 12/12/2018.]
December 10, 2018 Filing 50 Memorandum to Transferee Court from Transferor Court containing case-specific details to help aid in transfer. (ceh) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 12/12/2018.]
November 30, 2018 Filing 49 REPLY to Response to Motion re #26 MOTION to Exclude - Bayer's Daubert Motion to Exclude Dr. Wojciech Mazur's Expert Opinions - Bayer's Response to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Response to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Dr. Wojciech Mazur's Expert Opinions filed by Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 16 - Salem 2018 Article, #2 Exhibit 17 - Solomon Supplemental Report, #3 Exhibit 18 - Mazur Deposition Excerpts, #4 Exhibit 19 - Mazur Addendum, #5 Exhibit 20 - FDA Webpage)(Lueckenhoff, Terry) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 12/12/2018.]
November 30, 2018 Filing 48 REPLY to Response to Motion re #23 MOTION for Summary Judgment - Bayer's Response to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Schering Pharma AG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 26 - Salem 2018 Article, #2 Exhibit 27 - Salem 2017 Article, #3 Exhibit 28 Mazur Deposition Excerpts, #4 Exhibit 29 - Mazur Addendum, #5 Exhibit 30 - Solomon Supplemental Report)(Lueckenhoff, Terry) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 12/12/2018.]
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 85 - Order Disbanding the Plaintiffs' Steering Committee. Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 11/20/2018. (arf) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 12/12/2018.]
November 16, 2018 Filing 46 RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiffs' Supplemental Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Courtney C. Blasius. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Salem 2018, #2 Exhibit 2 Mazur Addendum)(Abaray, Janet) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 12/12/2018.]
November 16, 2018 Filing 45 RESPONSE in Opposition re #26 MOTION to Exclude - Bayer's Daubert Motion to Exclude Dr. Wojciech Mazur's Expert Opinions Plaintiff's Supplemental Response In Opposition To Defendants' Motion To Exclude Dr. Wojciech Mazur's Expert Opinions filed by Courtney C. Blasius. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Salem 2018, #2 Exhibit 2 Mazur Addendum, #3 Exhibit 3 Sedlak 2013, #4 Exhibit 4 11.7.18 Mazur Dep Tr, #5 Exhibit 5 Solomon Supp Report, #6 Exhibit 6 E14 Guidance For Industry, #7 Exhibit 7 6.16.17 Mazur Dep Tr Excerpts)(Abaray, Janet) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 12/12/2018.]
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #43 Motion for Order to Amend CMO 83 Deadlines. See Order for details. Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 10/27/2018. (ceh) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 12/12/2018.]
October 26, 2018 Filing 43 MOTION for Order toJoint Motion to Modify CMO 83 Deadline by Courtney C. Blasius. (Abaray, Janet) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 12/12/2018.]
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #41 Motion for Order to Amend CMO 83 deadlines. See Order establishing new deadlines concerning supplemental reports/motions. Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 9/19/2018. (ceh) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 12/12/2018.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 41 MOTION for Order to - Defendants' Motion to Modify CMO 83 Deadlines by Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Schering Pharma AG. (Lueckenhoff, Terry) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 12/12/2018.]
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #38 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Supplement Their Opposition to (1) Defendants' Motions to Exclude the Expert Opinion of Dr. Wojciech Mazur; and (2) Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment. Pursuant to SDIL Local Rule 7.1(c), the Court finds that the supplemental expert report of Dr. Mazur is appropriately submitted based on a change in facts after the filing of the parties' briefs. Defendants' opposition falls to the weight and credibility of the expert and does not necessitate the need to prevent the supplemental report. Accordingly, plaintiffs are permitted to supplement the record with Dr. Mazur's supplemental report describing a topical August 2018 study. To the extent defendants request the relief laid out in the conclusion of their #39 opposition, the Court directs defendants to file a motion offering an appropriate scheduling order by 9/18/2018. Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 9/6/2018. (ceh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 12/12/2018.]
August 31, 2018 Filing 39 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #38 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Motion For Leave to Supplement Their Opposition to (1)Defendants' Motions to Exclude the Expert Opinion of Dr. Wojciech Mazur and (2) Defendants' Motions For Summary Judgment filed by Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Schering Pharma AG. (Lueckenhoff, Terry) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 12/12/2018.]
August 17, 2018 Filing 38 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Motion For Leave to Supplement Their Opposition to (1)Defendants' Motions to Exclude the Expert Opinion of Dr. Wojciech Mazur and (2) Defendants' Motions For Summary Judgment by Courtney C. Blasius. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Dr. Mazur Report of August 2018, #2 Exhibit B - Salem 2018 Study)(Abaray, Janet) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 12/12/2018.]
February 2, 2018 Filing 37 REPLY to Response to Motion re #23 MOTION for Summary Judgment - Bayer's Reply Memoradum in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Schering Pharma AG. (Lueckenhoff, Terry) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 12/12/2018.]
January 26, 2018 Filing 36 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 7, #7 Exhibit 8, #8 Exhibit 9)(Tregre, Calvin) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 12/12/2018.]
January 26, 2018 Filing 35 RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Courtney C. Blasius. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Filed Under Seal, #2 Exhibit 2 - Filed Under Seal, #3 Exhibit 3 - Filed Under Seal, #4 Exhibit 4 - Filed Under Seal, #5 Exhibit 5 - Filed Under Seal, #6 Exhibit 6 - Filed Under Seal, #7 Exhibit 7 - Filed Under Seal, #8 Exhibit 8 - Filed Under Seal, #9 Exhibit 9 - Filed Under Seal)(Tregre, Calvin) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 12/12/2018.]
January 26, 2018 Filing 34 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 7, #7 Exhibit 8, #8 Exhibit 9, #9 Exhibit 10)(Tregre, Calvin) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 12/12/2018.]
January 26, 2018 Filing 33 RESPONSE in Opposition re #26 MOTION to Exclude - Bayer's Daubert Motion to Exclude Dr. Wojciech Mazur's Expert Opinions Plaintiffs' Response In Opposition To Defendants' Motion To Exclude Dr. Wojciech Mazur's Expert Opinions filed by Courtney C. Blasius. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Filed Under Seal, #2 Exhibit 2 - Filed Under Seal, #3 Exhibit 3 - Filed Under Seal, #4 Exhibit 4 - Filed Under Seal, #5 Exhibit 5 - Filed Under Seal, #6 Exhibit 6 - Filed Under Seal, #7 Exhibit 7 - Filed Under Seal, #8 Exhibit 8 - Filed Under Seal, #9 Exhibit 9 - Filed Under Seal, #10 Exhibit 10 - Filed Under Seal)(Tregre, Calvin) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 12/12/2018.]
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 Unopposed Motion to Modify CMO 83 deadlines. Plaintiffs have up to and including January 26, 2018 to file their responses to pending dispositive and Daubert motions. Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 1/22/2018. (ceh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 12/12/2018.]
January 22, 2018 Filing 31 MOTION to Amend/Correct 22 Order on Motion for Order, Unopposed Motion to Modify CMO 83 Deadlines by Courtney C. Blasius. (Tregre, Calvin) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 12/12/2018.]
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #29 Motion to Amend/Correct. Plaintiff's responses to dispostive and Daubert motions due on or before January 22, 2018. Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 1/12/2018. (ceh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 12/12/2018.]
January 12, 2018 Filing 29 MOTION to Amend/Correct 22 Order on Motion for Order, Unopposed Motion to Modify CMO 83 Deadlines by Courtney C. Blasius. (Tregre, Calvin) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 12/12/2018.]
December 15, 2017 Filing 28 Sealed Document. (Lueckenhoff, Terry) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 12/12/2018.]
December 15, 2017 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM in Support re #26 MOTION to Exclude - Bayer's Daubert Motion to Exclude Dr. Wojciech Mazur's Expert Opinions filed by Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Schering Pharma AG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Mazur 02-21-17 Report (Blasius), #2 Exhibit 2 - Sealed, #3 Exhibit 3 - Sedlak 2013, #4 Exhibit 4 - Mazur Deposition, #5 Exhibit 5 - Gossett Reports, #6 Exhibit 6 - Mazur 04-06-17 Rebuttal Report (Blasius), #7 Exhibit 7 - Mazur 04-06-17 Rebuttal Report (Evans), #8 Exhibit 8 - Guidance E14, #9 Exhibit 9 - Davis Reports, #10 Exhibit 10 - Whiting Letter, #11 Exhibit 11 - Dinger 2007, #12 Exhibit 12 - PSUR 16 2013, #13 Exhibit 13 - Oct 19 2017 Tregre Letter, #14 Exhibit 14 - Nov 9 2017 Tregre Letter, #15 Exhibit 15 - Mazur CV_Redacted)(Lueckenhoff, Terry) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 12/12/2018.]
December 15, 2017 Filing 26 MOTION to Exclude - Bayer's Daubert Motion to Exclude Dr. Wojciech Mazur's Expert Opinions by Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Schering Pharma AG. (Lueckenhoff, Terry) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 12/12/2018.]
December 15, 2017 Filing 25 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 - Sealed, #2 Exhibit 3 - Sealed, #3 Exhibit 4 - Sealed, #4 Exhibit 5 - Sealed, #5 Exhibit 7 - Sealed, #6 Exhibit 8 - Sealed, #7 Exhibit 10 - Sealed, #8 Exhibit 12 - Sealed, #9 Exhibit 13 - Sealed, #10 Exhibit 16 - Sealed)(Lueckenhoff, Terry) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 12/12/2018.]
December 15, 2017 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Support re #23 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Schering Pharma AG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Sealed, #2 Exhibit 2 - Sealed, #3 Exhibit 3 - Sealed, #4 Exhibit 4 - Sealed, #5 Exhibit 5 - Sealed, #6 Exhibit 6 - Gossett Reports, #7 Exhibit 7 - Sealed, #8 Exhibit 8 - Sealed, #9 Exhibit 9 - Solomon Reports, #10 Exhibit 10 - Sealed, #11 Exhibit 11 - Evans Deposition, #12 Exhibit 12 - Sealed, #13 Exhibit 13 - Sealed, #14 Exhibit 14 - Mazur Deposition, #15 Exhibit 15 - Mazur 02-21-17 Report (Blasius), #16 Exhibit 16 - Sealed, #17 Exhibit 17 - Mazur 04-06-17 Rebuttal Report (Blasius), #18 Exhibit 18 - Mazur 04-06-17 Rebuttal Report (Evans), #19 Exhibit 19 - Sedlak 2013, #20 Exhibit 20 - Guidance E14, #21 Exhibit 21 - Dinger 2007, #22 Exhibit 22 - Yasmin Approval Letter, #23 Exhibit 23 - Gossett Deposition, #24 Exhibit 24 - Eltabbakh Deposition, #25 Exhibit 25 - DelRosario Deposition)(Lueckenhoff, Terry) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 12/12/2018.]
December 15, 2017 Filing 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Schering Pharma AG. Responses due by 1/19/2018 (Lueckenhoff, Terry) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 12/12/2018.]
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Joint Motion to Modify CMO 83 Deadlines. The Court hereby adopts the proposed amended briefing schedule contained in document #21 . Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 11/13/2017. (ceh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 12/12/2018.]
November 10, 2017 Filing 21 MOTION for Order to - Joint Motion to Modify CMO 83 Deadlines by Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Lueckenhoff, Terry) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 12/12/2018.]
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Order to Modify CMO 83 Deadlines. The Court hereby adopts the scheduling order contained within. Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 9/5/2017. (ceh) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 12/12/2018.]
August 31, 2017 Filing 19 MOTION for Order to - Unopposed Motion to Modify CMO 83 Deadlines by Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Lueckenhoff, Terry) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 12/12/2018.]
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Order to Modify CMO 83 Deadlines. The deadlines contained herein are adopted by the Court extending current due dates for concluding depositions and filing dispositive motions. Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 7/17/2017. (ceh) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 12/12/2018.]
July 14, 2017 Filing 17 Joint MOTION for Order to - Joint Motion to Modify CMO 83 Deadlines by Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Lueckenhoff, Terry) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 12/12/2018.]
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Joint Motion to Modify CMO 83 Deadlines. The Court adopts the extended deadlines set forth in the parties' jointly agreed upon stipulation. Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 5/1/2017. (ceh) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 12/12/2018.]
April 27, 2017 Filing 15 Joint MOTION for Order to - Joint Motion to Modify CMO 83 Deadlines by Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Lueckenhoff, Terry) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 12/12/2018.]
February 23, 2017 ***Set/Clear Flags (Herndon, David) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 12/12/2018.]
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 1/23/2017. (dsw) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 12/12/2018.]
January 13, 2017 Filing 13 MOTION to Amend/Correct PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED MOTION TO MODIFY CMO 83 DEADLINES by Courtney C. Blasius. (Tregre, Calvin) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 12/12/2018.]
November 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Regarding CMO 83 Dispute. Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 11/23/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defense Letter Brief, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff Letter Brief)(dsw) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 12/12/2018.]
May 6, 2016 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Janet G. Abaray on behalf of Courtney C. Blasius (Abaray, Janet) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 12/12/2018.]
May 6, 2016 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by David C. Harman on behalf of Courtney C. Blasius (Harman, David) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 12/12/2018.]
May 6, 2016 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Calvin S. Tregre, Jr on behalf of Courtney C. Blasius (Tregre, Calvin) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 12/12/2018.]
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NUMBER 60, Settlement Agreement and Deadlines - Gallbladder Injuries. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 3/15/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Signed Settlement Agreement), #2 Exhibit B (Notice of Intent to Opt Out Form - Appendix B-1), #3 Exhibit C (Notice of Intent to Opt In Form - Appendix B-2), #4 Exhibit D (Declaration - Appendix G))(dsw) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 12/12/2018.]
April 25, 2011 Filing 7 ANSWER to #2 Complaint, and Additional Defenses by Bayer Schering Pharma AG.(Lueckenhoff, Terry) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 12/12/2018.]
March 3, 2011 Filing 6 ANSWER to #2 Complaint, and Additional Defenses by Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Lueckenhoff, Terry) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 12/12/2018.]
June 11, 2010 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Courtney C. Blasius. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Lanham, Samuel) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 12/12/2018.]
June 11, 2010 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Courtney C. Blasius. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Lanham, Samuel) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 12/12/2018.]
May 11, 2010 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Bayer Healthcare Pharmauceuticals, Inc., Bayer Schering Pharma AG. (drb) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 12/12/2018.]
May 11, 2010 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Bayer AG, Bayer Corporation, Bayer Healthcare Pharmauceuticals, Inc., Bayer Healthcare, LLC, Bayer Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Bayer Schering Pharma AG, Berlex Laboratories Inc., Berlex, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0754-1112127.), filed by Courtney C. Blasius. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Lanham, Samuel) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 12/12/2018.]
May 11, 2010 Filing 1 Case Opened. Documents may now be electronically filed. Case number 10-10797-DRH-PMF must be placed on all documents prior to filing them electronically. (drb) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 12/12/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blasius v. Bayer Healthcare Pharmauceuticals, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Healthcare LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Schering Pharma AG
Represented By: Adam L. Hoeflich
Represented By: Terry Lueckenhoff
Represented By: Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr
Represented By: John E. Galvin
Represented By: Terry Lueckenhoff, Esq.
Represented By: John E. Galvin, Esq.
Represented By: Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berlex Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berlex, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Adam L. Hoeflich
Represented By: Terry Lueckenhoff
Represented By: Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr
Represented By: John E. Galvin
Represented By: Terry Lueckenhoff, Esq.
Represented By: John E. Galvin, Esq.
Represented By: Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney C. Blasius
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: David C. Harman
Represented By: Michael A. London, Esq.
Represented By: Janet G. Abaray
Represented By: Samuel W. Lanham, Jr.
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Calvin S. Tregre, Jr.
Represented By: Roger C. Denton, Esq.
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer, Esq.
Represented By: David C. Harman, Esq.
Represented By: Samuel W. Lanham, Jr., Esq.
Represented By: Michael S. Burg, Esq.
Represented By: Calvin S. Tregre, Jr., Esq.
Represented By: Janet G. Abaray, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?