Brower v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston et al

Plaintiff: Katherine M. Brower
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston, A Lincoln Financial Company and Rutland Hospital, Inc. Employee Health, Dental and Vision Insurance
Case Number: 5:2019cv00029
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Geoffrey W Crawford
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston, A Lincoln Financial Company answer due 5/16/2019; granting #5 MOTION to Dismiss Rutland Hospital, Inc. Employee Health, Dental and Vision Insurance without Prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 4/2/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (jal)
April 1, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston, A Lincoln Financial Company (Decker, Byrne)
April 1, 2019 Filing 5 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss Rutland Hospital, Inc. Employee Health, Dental and Vision Insurance without Prejudice filed by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston, A Lincoln Financial Company.(Decker, Byrne) Text clarified on 4/2/2019 (jlh).
April 1, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston, A Lincoln Financial Company.(Decker, Byrne)
March 15, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston, A Lincoln Financial Company waiver sent on 2/15/2019, answer due 4/16/2019.(McDonald, Joseph)
March 12, 2019 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Rutland Hospital, Inc. Employee Health, Dental and Vision Insurance waiver sent on 2/15/2019, answer due 4/16/2019.(McDonald, Joseph)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston, A Lincoln Financial Company, Rutland Hospital, Inc. Employee Health, Dental and Vision Insurance filed by Katherine M. Brower. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (pac) Parties clarified on 2/14/2019 (law).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brower v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston, A Lincoln Financial Company
Represented By: Byrne J. Decker, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rutland Hospital, Inc. Employee Health, Dental and Vision Insurance
Represented By: F. David Harlow, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine M. Brower
Represented By: Joseph P. McDonald, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?