Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company v. Diversified Construction Management, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Defendant: Erin McKenna and Diversified Construction Management, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00031
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Geoffrey W Crawford
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2019 Filing 10 ENE LETTER re: Potential Evaluators sent; responses due by 5/3/2019. (eh)
April 15, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Diversified Construction Management, LLC, Erin McKenna. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Byrne, Matthew)
April 4, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Erin McKenna served on 3/26/2019, answer due 4/16/2019.(Chambers, Paula-Lee)
April 4, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Diversified Construction Management, LLC served on 3/26/2019, answer due 4/16/2019.(Chambers, Paula-Lee)
March 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Jeff Hardiman by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Hardiman, Jeffrey)
March 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paula-Lee Chambers, Esq on behalf of Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company.(Chambers, Paula-Lee)
March 8, 2019 ISSUED Summons as to Diversified Construction Management, LLC, Erin McKenna.(law)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Paula-Lee Chambers. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 2/21/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (jal)
February 21, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (Hardiman, Jeffrey)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Paula-Lee Chambers filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(jlh)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Diversified Construction Management, LLC, Erin McKenna filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(law)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company v. Diversified Construction Management, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erin McKenna
Represented By: Matthew B. Byrne, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diversified Construction Management, LLC
Represented By: Matthew B. Byrne, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Hardiman, Esq.
Represented By: Paula-Lee Chambers, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?