Sutton v. Purzycki
Plaintiff: Donald James Sutton, Jr.
Defendant: Felicity Purzycki
Case Number: 5:2019cv00085
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Geoffrey W Crawford
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Filing 19 LETTER remanding case to Vermont Superior Court, Civil Division, Bennington Unit. (law)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REMANDING CASE to Vermont Superior Court and denying #17 MOTION for Reconsideration re #15 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 6/17/2019. (esb)
June 14, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Reconsideration re #15 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer filed by Donald James Sutton, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Robbason, Antonin)
June 14, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE re 5 Order by Felicity Purzycki. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Strecker, Rachel)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer. Felicity Purzycki answer due 8/15/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 6/10/2019. (pjl)
June 5, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Antonin I.Z. Robbason, Esq. on behalf of Donald James Sutton, Jr. (originally filed 5/28/2019 in state court). (pjl)
June 5, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #7 Complaint filed by Donald James Sutton, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (originally filed 5/28/2019 in state court). (pjl)
June 5, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Filing #1 Notice of Removal by Felicity Purzycki (originally filed 5/28/2019 in state court). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (pjl)
June 5, 2019 Filing 11 LIMITED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rachel B. Strecker, Esq. on behalf of Felicity Purzycki (originally filed 5/28/2019 in state court). (pjl)
June 5, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #7 Complaint filed by Felicity Purzycki (originally filed 5/20/2019 in state court). (pjl)
June 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE For Self-Represented Litigant by Felicity Purzycki (originally filed 5/20/2019 in state court). (pjl)
June 5, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE. Felicity Purzycki served on 4/29/2019. (Originally filed 5/13/2019 in state court) (pjl)
June 5, 2019 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against Felicity Purzycki filed by Donald James Sutton, Jr. (originally filed 5/13/2019 in state court). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) (pjl)
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 RECEIVED FILE and certified copy of docket sheet from State Court. (pjl)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: re #3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant shall file a memorandum within ten (10) days explaining why this diversity case may be removed by a Vermont resident. See 28 U.S.C. 1441(b)(2). Any response shall be filed within ten (10) days thereafter. The time to answer is extended until such time as the court issues a ruling on this threshold issue of subject matter jurisdiction. (This is a text-only Order.) Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 6/4/2019. (jal)
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER to Vermont Superior Court, Bennington Unit, Civil Division requesting a certified copy of the docket sheet and the complete original file. (esb)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Felicity Purzycki. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (esb)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 LIMITED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rachel B. Strecker, Esq on behalf of Felicity Purzycki. (esb)
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Felicity Purzycki from Vermont Superior Court, Bennington Unit, Civil Division, case number unknown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (esb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sutton v. Purzycki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felicity Purzycki
Represented By: Rachel B. Strecker, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald James Sutton, Jr.
Represented By: Antonin I.Z Robbason, Esq.
Represented By: William A. O'Rourke, III
Represented By: Mark F. Werle, Esq.
Represented By: Antonin I.Z. Robbason, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?