Friends of Pine Street v. Everett et al

Plaintiff: Friends of Pine Street
Defendant: Thomas D. Everett, Joe Flynn and Miro Weinburger
Case Number: 5:2019cv00095
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Geoffrey W Crawford
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 42:4321
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #3 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Friends of Pine Street. The cover letter included has been removed as cover letters should not be included when filing electronically. The corrected document is now attached to #3 and this entry. (law)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Miro Weinburger waiver sent on 6/10/2019, answer due 8/9/2019.(Hill, Cindy) (Main Document 3 replaced on 7/30/2019) (law).
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Thomas D. Everett, Joe Flynn, Miro Weinburger filed by Friends of Pine Street. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Certificate of Service) (esb)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Thomas D. Everett, Joe Flynn, Miro Weinburger filed by Friends of Pine Street. (Attachments: #1 Table of Significant Changes, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (pjl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Friends of Pine Street v. Everett et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas D. Everett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miro Weinburger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Friends of Pine Street
Represented By: Cindy E. Hill, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?